Bryant v. IDOC et al
Petitioner: Roy L. Bryant
Respondent: Shawnee CC Medical Dept. and IDOC
Case Number: 3:2019cv01174
Filed: October 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Rosenstengel
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Filing 11 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in a Civil Case approved by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 12/23/2019. (jaj)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice for lack of federal jurisdiction. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 12/23/2019. (jrj)
December 23, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION - Scanning Centralia added for receipt of electronic transmissions. (jaj)
December 20, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Change of Address by Roy L. Bryant. (jsm2)
November 27, 2019 Initial Prisoner Filing Fee: $ 8.67 received, receipt number 34625097774 (cds)
November 25, 2019 Filing 8 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Roy L. Bryant. (jsm2)
November 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Address by Roy L. Bryant. (jsm2)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis ("IFP") (Doc. #2 ). Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(b)(1), Plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $8.67. The agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to forward the initial partial filing fee from Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of Court upon receipt of this Order. Plaintiff shall make monthly payments of 20% of the preceding month's income credited to Plaintiff's prison trust fund account (including all deposits to the inmate account from any source) until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The agency having custody of Plaintiff shall forward payments from Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of this Court each time the amount in the account exceeds $10 until the $350.00 filing fee is paid.In addition, Plaintiff shall note that the filing fees for multiple cases cumulate. See Newlin v. Helman, 123 F.3d 429, 436 (7th Cir. 1997), overruled in part on other grounds by Lee v. Clinton, 209 F.3d 1025 (7th Cir. 2000); Walker v. O'Brien, 216 F.3d 626 (7th Cir. 2000). A prisoner who files one suit must remit 20% of his monthly income to the Clerk of the Court until his fees have been paid; a prisoner who files a second suit or an appeal must remit 40%; and so on. Newlin, 123 F.3d at 436. "Five suits or appeals mean that the prisoner's entire monthly income must be turned over to the court until the fees have been paid." Id. Payments shall be mailed to: Clerk of the Court, United States District Court for the Southern District of Illinois, 750 Missouri Avenue, East St. Louis, Illinois 62201. The Clerk is DIRECTED to mail a copy of this Order to the Trust Fund Officer at the Shawnee Correctional Center upon entry of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 11/6/2019. (tjk)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 4, 2019 Filing 5 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement. (jaj)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Plaintiff has filed a Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis ("IFP") in this case (see Doc. #2 ), but has failed to provide the necessary prisoner trust fund account information as required by the PLRA to determine whether the inmate is entitled to proceed without prepaying fees and costs. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(b)(1), the Court must review the prisoner trust fund account statement for the 6 month period immediately preceding the filing of this action. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Plaintiff shall provide the Clerk of Court with the attached certification completed by the Trust Fund Officer at the facility and a copy of his/her trust fund account statement (or institutional equivalent) for the period 4/1/2019 to 10/28/2019 no later than 45 days from the date of this order. Failure to do so will result in dismissal of this action for failure to comply with an Order of this Court. Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). See generally Ladien v. Astrachan, 128 F.3d 1051 (7th Cir. 1997); Johnson v. Kamminga, 34 F.3d 466 (7th Cir. 1994). The Clerk is DIRECTED to mail a copy of this Order and the certification form to the Trust Fund Officer at Shawnee Correctional Center. (Trust Fund Statement due on or before 12/16/2019). Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 11/1/2019. (tjk)
October 28, 2019 Filing 3 Letter to Petitioner advising of case number. #1 Consent to Magistrate Judge) (jsm2)
October 28, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Roy L. Bryant. (jsm2)
October 28, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Mandamus filed by Roy L. Bryant.(jsm2)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bryant v. IDOC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Roy L. Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Shawnee CC Medical Dept.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: IDOC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?