Gaudreau v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Amberly Gaudreau
Defendant: Bowlby Farms LLC, Ed Burris Disposal Service, LLC, National Railroad Passenger Corporation (AMTRAK), Illinois Central Railroad Company and National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Case Number: 3:2019cv01278
Filed: November 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gilbert C Sison
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2020 Filing 27 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Brown, Nathaniel)
January 16, 2020 Filing 26 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Kurz, Mark)
January 15, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE OF MODIFICATION re #24 Notice of Initial Magistrate Assignment. Document modified to include Illinois Central Railroad Company. (dkd)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 15, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, this case is reassigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison. District Judge Staci M. Yandle no longer assigned to the case. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Bowlby Farms LLC, Illinois Central Railroad Company, Amberly Gaudreau, National Railroad Passenger Corporation. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 19-cv-1278-GCS. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. Consent due by 2/5/2020.(dkd) Modified on 1/15/2020 (dkd).
January 15, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE OF ACTION re #22 Answer to Complaint filed by Bowlby Farms LLC.See Local Rule 83.1(f). In all cases filed in, removed to, or transferred to this court, all attorneys, including government attorneys, shall file a written entry of appearance before addressing the court. Attorney Nester does not have a Notice of Appearance on file in this case. (kdw)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 14, 2020 Filing 22 Defendant, Bowlby Farms, LLC ANSWER to Complaint by Plaintiff by Bowlby Farms LLC.(Nester, David)
December 23, 2019 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint by National Railroad Passenger Corporation.(Kurz, Mark)
December 23, 2019 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Support re #19 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Illinois Central Railroad Company. (Kurz, Mark)
December 23, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss by Illinois Central Railroad Company. Responses due by 1/27/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Kurz, Mark)
December 20, 2019 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Amberly Gaudreau. Ed Burris Disposal Service, LLC waiver sent on 12/2/2019, answer due 1/31/2020. (Brown, Nathaniel)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Illinois Central Railroad Company shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint on or before December 23, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison on 12/11/2019. (kll)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 10, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Illinois Central Railroad Company. (Kurz, Mark)
December 10, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark R. Kurz on behalf of Illinois Central Railroad Company (Kurz, Mark)
December 3, 2019 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Ed Burris Disposal Service, LLC and original mailed to Attorney Brown. (kdw)
December 3, 2019 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Bowlby Farms LLC and original mailed to Attorney Brown. (kdw)
December 3, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Illinois Central Railroad Company and original mailed to Attorney Brown. (kdw)
November 27, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Requested. (Brown, Nathaniel)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint on or before December 23, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison on 11/25/2019. (kll)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 22, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathaniel O. Brown on behalf of Amberly Gaudreau (Brown, Nathaniel)
November 21, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by National Railroad Passenger Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Kurz, Mark)
November 21, 2019 Filing 7 EXHIBIT by National Railroad Passenger Corporation. Exhibit to #1 Notice of Removal . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)(Kurz, Mark)
November 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #4 Notice of Appearance filed by Illinois Central Railroad Company. Document stricken per filer's request. (cds)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark R. Kurz on behalf of National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Kurz, Mark)
November 21, 2019 Filing 4 STRICKEN - NOTICE of Appearance by Mark R. Kurz on behalf of Illinois Central Railroad Company (Kurz, Mark) Modified on 11/21/2019 (cds).
November 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ACTION re #1 Notice of Removal filed by National Railroad Passenger Corporation. See Local Rule 83.1(f). In all cases filed in, removed to, or transferred to this court, all attorneys, including government attorneys, shall file a written entry of appearance before addressing the court. Attorney Kruz does not have a Notice of Appearance on file in this case. In addition the Civil Cover Sheet was not filed as an attachment to the Complaint as instructed. The Civil Cover sheet must be filed using the event found under Civil > Other Documents > Exhibit and linked back to the Complaint docket entry. (kdw)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 21, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Staci M. Yandle and Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison assigned. All future documents must bear case number 19-1278-SMY-GCS. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (Attachments: #1 Consent Brochure)(kdw)
November 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Williamson County, case number 2019-L-153 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-4031857), filed by National Railroad Passenger Corporation (AMTRAK). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Kurz, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gaudreau v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bowlby Farms LLC
Represented By: David A. Nester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ed Burris Disposal Service, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation (AMTRAK)
Represented By: Mark R. Kurz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illinois Central Railroad Company
Represented By: Mark R. Kurz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Represented By: Mark R. Kurz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amberly Gaudreau
Represented By: Nathaniel O. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?