Mohammad v. Lashbrook et al
Plaintiff: Mansour Mohammad
Defendant: Jacqueline Lashbrook, Wexford Health Sources, Inc., Louis Shicker, C/O Wilson, John Doe and Lt. Morris
Case Number: 3:2019cv01330
Filed: December 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Office: East St. Louis Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Rosenstengel
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Plaintiff has informed the Court that he does not wish to proceed with this case. Consequently, this action is DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i). This dismissal shall not count as a "strike" within the meaning of 28 U.S.C. 1915(g), and the record shall reflect that the filing fee is satisfied and no payments shall be collected from Plaintiff. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 1/24/2020. (tjk)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 21, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Opt Not to Proceed by Mansour Mohammad. (jsm2)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. This case was severed from Mohammad v. Lashbrook, Case No. 19-cv-00756, and contains claims designated as Counts 3, 4, and 5 regarding Plaintiff's medical treatment. Plaintiff is granted and extension of time and shall have until January 24, 2020, to advise the Court in writing whether he wishes to proceed with this lawsuit containing Counts 3, 4, and 5. To the extent he has questions regarding the status of his claims in other cases, Plaintiff is advised he must file a separate motion in the appropriate case. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 1/8/2020. (jrj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 2, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to 4 Order by Mansour Mohammad. (jsm2)
December 9, 2019 Set Deadlines: Action due by 1/10/2020. (kek)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: On December 6, 2019, this case was severed from Mohammad v. Lashbrook, et al, SDIL Case No. 19-cv-756-SMY. Plaintiff should be aware of the consequences of proceeding with this action. First, the Court will screen the action pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A, and Plaintiff will incur a strike within the meaning of section 1915(g) if the Court determines that the action is frivolous or malicious, fails to state a claim on which relief may be granted, or seeks monetary relief against a defendant who is immune from such relief. Second, Plaintiff will be required to pay an additional $350.00 filing fee in this case. Of course, Plaintiff can also opt not to proceed with this action by voluntarily dismissing it, thereby avoiding the risk of a strike and the financial burden of an additional filing fee. Plaintiff should carefully consider these points, along with the merits and relative importance of this lawsuit, in deciding whether to proceed with it. Plaintiff shall have until January 10, 2020, to advise the Court in writing whether he wishes to proceed with this lawsuit. If he chooses to go forward, the Court will assess an initial partial filing fee (if appropriate) and screen the complaint. On the other hand, if Plaintiff opts to voluntarily dismiss the case by the deadline, he will not have to pay a filing fee, the Court will not screen the complaint, and the case will be dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff is WARNED that if he fails to respond to this Order by the deadline, he will be obligated to pay the full filing fee and this action will be dismissed for want of prosecution and/or for failure to comply with a court order. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 12/6/2019. (tjk)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 6, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Mansour Mohammad. (tjk)
December 6, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against John Doe, John Doe, Jacqueline Lashbrook, Lt. Morris, Louis Shicker, Wexford Health Sources, Inc., C/O Wilson, filed by Mansour Mohammad. (Attachments: #1 medical records)(tjk)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER severing case number 19-756-SMY. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 12/5/2019. (tjk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mohammad v. Lashbrook et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacqueline Lashbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wexford Health Sources, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis Shicker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mansour Mohammad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?