Soth v. Acuff
Petitioner: Nath Soth
Respondent: Damon Acuff
Case Number: 3:2019cv01351
Filed: December 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Staci M Yandle
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2020 Filing 16 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Approved by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 1/29/2020. (beb)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Dismiss as Moot. This action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 1/29/2020. (beb)
January 29, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Petition as Moot by Damon Acuff. Responses due by 3/2/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Del Rivero)(Biersbach, Nicholas)
January 23, 2020 Filing 13 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Documents 9 & 10 sent to Nath Soth. (jaj)
January 23, 2020 Filing 12 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Document 8 sent to Nath Soth. (jaj)
January 13, 2020 Filing 11 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Document 5 sent to Nath Soth. (jaj)
January 6, 2020 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED on 12/31/2019. (tjk)
January 6, 2020 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED on 12/27/2019. (tjk)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Respondent has filed a response (Doc. #7 ) to the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, along with an exhibit (Doc. [7-1]). Petitioner shall file any reply that he has to the factual or legal matters raised by Respondent on or before February 17, 2020. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 1/3/2020. (beb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 3, 2020 Filing 7 RESPONSE to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Damon Acuff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Edgar Del Rivero)(Biersbach, Nicholas)
January 3, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas J. Biersbach on behalf of Damon Acuff (Biersbach, Nicholas)
December 30, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED as to Attorney General on 12/26/2019. (tjk)
December 17, 2019 Filing 4 Letter to Warden of Pulaski County constituting service. (tjk)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order for Service of Process upon Warden. Respondent shall answer the Petition within twenty (20) days of the date this order is entered (on or before January 6, 2020). Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 12/16/2019. (beb)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 The Court has received your Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and filing fee. Your case number is 19-1351-SMY. The following is important information concerning the initial stages of your lawsuit. The Court will review your petition to determine whether it survives preliminary review under Rule 4 and Rule 1(b) of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases in United States District Courts. The Court will conduct this review within the next 60 days and inform you of the findings in an Order. No other action will be taken in your case during this time, absent extraordinary circumstances. Therefore, you do not need to submit any evidence, argument, motions, or other documents. If you do not receive a preliminary review Order within the next 60 days, you may file a motion requesting the status of your case. If you filed a motion for recruitment of counsel, it will not be considered until the Court has completed the preliminary review of your petition. Please note that any motion for recruitment of counsel must include evidence of your own efforts to find counsel such as a list of the attorneys you contacted and copies of letters you sent or received. See Pruitt v. Mote, 503 F.3d 647, 654-55 (7th Cir. 2007). In the event your petition survives the preliminary review, the Court will instruct the respondent to file a response to the petition and you will be notified of your deadline to file a reply. In addition, several administrative matters warrant mention. Any communication directed to the Court should be in the form of a motion or other pleading and not a letter. All mail should be sent to: Clerk's Office, U.S. District Court, 750 Missouri Avenue, East St. Louis, IL 62201. Finally, you are advised that if your address changes, you must notify the Court within seven days of the change by filing a Notice of Change of Address. Failure to do so could result in the dismissal of your case. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 12/12/2019. (jaj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 12, 2019 Filing fee paid in full: $ 5.00, receipt number 34625098009. (jaj)
December 12, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Nath Soth.(jaj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Soth v. Acuff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Damon Acuff
Represented By: Nicholas J. Biersbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Nath Soth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?