Doe v. Geico Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Lt John Doe, Lowell Lakin and John Doe
Defendant: Geico Casualty Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv01358
Filed: December 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gilbert C Sison
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2020 Filing 21 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Gilligan, John)
February 7, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE: Lowell Lakin and Geico Casualty Company was directed to file the attached form regarding consenting or declining to consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction. The time for doing so has now passed, and the Court has not received the form. As required by Administrative Order No. 257, Lowell Lakin and Geico Casualty Company shall return the form within 7 days or face possible sanctions. Consent due by 2/14/2020 (kdw)
February 3, 2020 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Remand filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Stipulation to Damages)(Caffey, Rodney)
January 22, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint by Geico Casualty Company.(Gilligan, John)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Setting Deadlines as to #9 MOTION to Remand. Although reply briefs are disfavored, given the issues raised in Defendant's response to the pending motion to remand, Plaintiff is DIRECTED to file a reply to Defendant's response, not to exceed 5 pages, on or before February 6, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison on 1/17/2020. (kll)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 16, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, this case is reassigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison. District J. Phil Gilbert no longer assigned to the case. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Geico Casualty Company, Lowell Lakin. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 19-1358-GCS. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. Consent due 2/6/2020.(lmb)
January 9, 2020 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION to Remand and Reply Brief in Support of Defendant's Petition for Removal filed by Geico Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Gilligan, John)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER discharging the Court's December 19, 2019, #6 Order to Show Cause in light of the #8 Amended Complaint naming plaintiff Lowell Lakin. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 1/8/2020. (tlp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 8, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF MODIFICATION re #8 Response filed by John Doe. Docket entry has been modified to reflect that the document filed at Doc. 8 is an Amended Complaint, not a response. In addition, named plaintiff has been updated from John Doe to Lowell Lakin. No further action is required by the filer in relation to this notification. (mar)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 6, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Rodney D. Caffey on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Caffey, Rodney)
January 6, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF ACTION re #10 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by John Doe, #8 Response filed by John Doe, #9 Motion to Remand filed by John Doe. See Local Rule 83.1(f). In all cases filed in, removed to, or transferred to this court, all attorneys, including government attorneys, shall file a written entry of appearance before addressing the court. Attorney Caffey does not have a Notice of Appearance on file in this case.(kdw)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 3, 2020 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION to Remand filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Amended Complaint and Answer, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Affidavit)(Caffey, Rodney)
January 3, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 2/6/2020 (Caffey, Rodney)
January 2, 2020 Filing 8 Amended Complaint filed by Lowell Lakin. (Caffey, Rodney) Modified on 1/8/2020 (mar).
December 20, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Geico Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Gilligan, John)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 1/3/2020. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 12/18/2019. (jdh)
December 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE REGARDING FILING re #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Geico Casualty Company, #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Geico Casualty Company. Other: Notice of Appearance and corporate disclosures are fillable documents. Fillable documents should be converted to non-fillable PDF before filing on CM/ECF. This Notice is sent for informational purposes only. (kdw)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 16, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert and Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison assigned. All future documents must bear case number 19-1358-JPG-GCS. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (Attachments: #1 Consent Brochure)(kdw)
December 13, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Geico Casualty Company identifying Corporate Parent Geico Corporation, Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway, Inc., Corporate Parent Geico Indemnity Company for Geico Casualty Company. (Gilligan, John)
December 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by John W. Gilligan, III on behalf of Geico Casualty Company (Gilligan, John)
December 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Madison County, case number 19 L 1573 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-4060650), filed by Geico Casualty Company.(Gilligan, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Geico Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geico Casualty Company
Represented By: John W. Gilligan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lt John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lowell Lakin
Represented By: Rodney D. Caffey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Rodney D. Caffey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?