Heartland Rail LLC v. Jordan Sands LLC et al
Plaintiff: Heartland Rail LLC
Defendant: Robert J Coughlan, Jordan Sands LLC and James P Coughlan
Case Number: 3:2020cv00189
Filed: February 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Reona J Daly
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE: James P. Coughlan was directed to file the attached form regarding consenting or declining to consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction. The time for doing so has now passed, and the Court has not received the form. As required by Administrative Order No. 257, James P. Coughlan shall return the form within 7 days or face possible sanctions. The Clerk notes that due to the COVID-19 public health crisis, deadlines that were pending on or before April 1, 2020 were extended in accord with Administrative Order No. 261 and/or Amended Administrative Order No. 261. This automated notice does not take into account any such extensions. If, after the expiration of the 7-day deadline set forth herein, the Court chooses to take further action, all applicable deadline extensions will be considered at that time. Consent due by 4/23/2020 (tba)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING #15 MOTION for Extension of Time. Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 261, Defendants James P Coughlan and Robert J Coughlan are GRANTED an extension of time, up to and including 4/23/2020, to file an answer or otherwise respond. Signed by Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly on 3/30/2020. (ely)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 25, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE OF MODIFICATION re #15 Stipulation filed by James P Coughlan. Document should have been entered as a Motion and has now been changed to a Motion. (tba)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 25, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing James P. Coughlan to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to James P. Coughlan on 3/25/2020. Consent due by 4/15/2020 (tba)
March 25, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE REGARDING FILING re #15 Stipulation filed by James P Coughlan.When pleadings contain multiple attorney signatures, the non-filing attorney must include the language with consent with his/her signature. See Section 2.1 of the CM/ECF Users Manual. This notice is for informational purposes and therefore no action is required. (tba)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 24, 2020 Filing 15 Motion for Extension of Time by James P Coughlan. (Eli, Lamis) Modified on 3/25/2020 (tba).
March 24, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Lamis G. Eli on behalf of James P Coughlan (Eli, Lamis)
March 13, 2020 Filing 13 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Eggmann, Robert)
March 12, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE: Heartland Rail LLC was directed to file the attached form regarding consenting or declining to consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction. The time for doing so has now passed, and the Court has not received the form. As required by Administrative Order No. 257, Heartland Rail LLC shall return the form within 7 days or face possible sanctions. Consent due by 3/19/2020 (tba)
March 12, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE by Heartland Rail LLC Affidavit of Service re Robert Coughlan (Eggmann, Robert)
March 12, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE by Heartland Rail LLC Affidavit of Service re Jordan Sands LLC (Eggmann, Robert)
March 12, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE by Heartland Rail LLC Affidavit of Service re James Coughlan (Eggmann, Robert)
February 19, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan Ross Lewis on behalf of Heartland Rail LLC (Lewis, Jordan)
February 19, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert E. Eggmann, III on behalf of Heartland Rail LLC (Eggmann, Robert)
February 19, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ACTION re #1 Complaint, filed by Heartland Rail LLC.See Local Rule 83.1(f). In all cases filed in, removed to, or transferred to this court, all attorneys, including government attorneys, shall file a written entry of appearance before addressing the court. Attorney Eggmann does not have a Notice of Appearance on file in this case. (tba)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 19, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Robert J Coughlan original mailed to Robert E. Eggmann. (tba)
February 19, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to James P Coughlan original mailed to Robert E. Eggmann. (tba)
February 19, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Jordan Sands LLC original mailed to Robert E. Eggmann. (tba)
February 19, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Heartland Rail LLC. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 20-189-RJD. Consent due by 3/11/2020 (tba)
February 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Heartland Rail LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-4118582.), filed by Heartland Rail LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons to Jordan Sands LLC, #6 Summons to J. Coughlan, #7 Summons to R. Coughlan)(Eggmann, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heartland Rail LLC v. Jordan Sands LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert J Coughlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jordan Sands LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James P Coughlan
Represented By: Lamis G. Eli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heartland Rail LLC
Represented By: Robert E. Eggmann, III
Represented By: Jordan Ross Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?