Oliver v. Werlich
Petitioner: Sheldon John Oliver
Respondent: T. G. Werlich
Case Number: 3:2020cv00214
Filed: February 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Rosenstengel
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Respondent has filed a response (Doc. #10 ) to the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, along with exhibits. Petitioner shall file any reply that he has to the factual or legal matters raised by Respondent on or before June 8, 2020. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 4/24/2020. (beb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 24, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by T. G. Werlich. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Ex 1 - Attachments 1 - 7, #3 Ex 1 - Attachment 8, #4 Exhibit 2)(Wyatt, Nathan)
April 13, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF MODIFICATION re #8 Return of Service on Habeas Corpus filed by T. G. Werlich. Answer due date will be modified to 4/29/20, as stated in Order Doc. 5) No further action is required by the filer in relation to this notification. (amv)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 10, 2020 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed on Habeas Corpus Acknowledgement Letter by T. G. Werlich. T. G. Werlich served on 4/10/2020, answer due 4/29/20. (Wyatt, Nathan)
April 10, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan E. Wyatt on behalf of T. G. Werlich (Wyatt, Nathan)
April 8, 2020 Filing 6 Letter to USAO constituting service. (tjk)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order for Service of Process upon T.G. Werlich. Respondent shall answer the petition on or before April 29, 2020. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 4/8/2020. (jrj)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING Petitioner's motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. 11 ) based on the financial information provided with his motion. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 3/3/2020. (tjk)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE AND ORDER: The Court has received your Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and a motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee. Your case number is 20-214-NJR. The following is important information concerning the initial stages of your lawsuit. After your filing fee status is determined the Court will review your petition to determine whether it survives preliminary review under Rule 4 and Rule 1(b) of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases in United States District Courts. The Court will conduct this review within the next 60 days and inform you of the findings in an Order. No other action will be taken in your case during this time, absent extraordinary circumstances. Therefore, you do not need to submit any evidence, argument, motions, or other documents. If you do not receive a preliminary review Order within the next 60 days, you may file a motion requesting the status of your case. If you filed a motion for recruitment of counsel, it will not be considered until the Court has completed the preliminary review of your petition. Please note that any motion for recruitment of counsel must include evidence of your own efforts to find counsel such as a list of the attorneys you contacted and copies of letters you sent or received. See Pruitt v. Mote, 503 F.3d 647, 654-55 (7th Cir. 2007). In the event your petition survives the preliminary review, the Court will instruct the respondent to file a response to the petition and you will be notified of your deadline to file a reply. In addition, several administrative matters warrant mention. Any communication directed to the Court should be in the form of a motion or other pleading and not a letter. All mail should be sent to: Clerk's Office, U.S. District Court, 750 Missouri Avenue, East St. Louis, IL 62201. Finally, you are advised that if your address changes, you must notify the Court within seven days of the change by filing a Notice of Change of Address. Failure to do so could result in the dismissal of your case. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 2/25/2020. (amv)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 25, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Sheldon John Oliver. (amv)
February 25, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Sheldon John Oliver.(amv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oliver v. Werlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: T. G. Werlich
Represented By: Nathan E. Wyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sheldon John Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?