Radick v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Jerry R. Radick
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSAOGC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00416
Filed: May 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Mark A Beatty
Referring Judge: J Phil Gilbert
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Garrison, Suzanne)
May 18, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Suzanne M. Garrison on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Garrison, Suzanne)
May 12, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security. Original mailed to Attorney Severs. (jlrr)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, granting #3 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jerry R. Radick. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 5/7/2020. (jdh)
May 6, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert and Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty assigned. All future documents must bear case number 20-416-JPG-MAB. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (ack)
May 6, 2020 Filing 3 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jerry R. Radick. (Severs, Traci)
May 6, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Traci L. Severs on behalf of Jerry R. Radick (Severs, Traci)
May 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Jerry R. Radick. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Commissioner of SSA)(Severs, Traci)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Radick v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry R. Radick
Represented By: Traci L. Severs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Suzanne M. Garrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSAOGC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?