Skeen v. Ernst et al
Plaintiff: Elizabeth M Skeen
Defendant: John Hickman, Robert Hickman and Connie J Ernst
Case Number: 3:2020cv00418
Filed: May 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2020 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service-Connie Ernst by Elizabeth M Skeens. (Wolkiewicz, Andrew)
June 23, 2020 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service-Robert Hickman by Elizabeth M Skeens. (Wolkiewicz, Andrew)
June 23, 2020 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service-John Hickman by Elizabeth M Skeens. (Wolkiewicz, Andrew)
June 1, 2020 Filing 10 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Wolkiewicz, Andrew)
May 29, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE: Elizabeth M. Skeens was directed to file the attached form regarding consenting or declining to consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction. The time for doing so has now passed, and the Court has not received the form. As required by Administrative Order No. 257, Elizabeth M. Skeens shall return the form within 7 days or face possible sanctions. The Clerk notes that due to the COVID-19 public health crisis, deadlines that were pending on or before April 1, 2020 were extended in accord with Administrative Order No. 261 and/or Amended Administrative Order No. 261. This automated notice does not take into account any such extensions. If, after the expiration of the 7-day deadline set forth herein, the Court chooses to take further action, all applicable deadline extensions will be considered at that time. Consent due by 6/5/2020 (kdw)
May 26, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Reissued as to Connie J Ernst, John Hickman, Robert Hickman. Originals mailed to Attorney Andrew V. Wolkiewicz (ack)
May 7, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew V. Wolkiewicz on behalf of Elizabeth M Skeens (Wolkiewicz, Andrew)
May 7, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Robert Hickman original mailed to Andrew V. Wolkiewicz. (tba)
May 7, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to John Hickman original mailed to Attorney Andrew V. Wolkiewicz. (tba)
May 7, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Connie J Ernst original mailed to Attorney Andrew V. Wolkiewicz. (tba)
May 7, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ACTION re #1 Complaint,, filed by Elizabeth M Skeen. See Local Rule 83.1(f). In all cases filed in, removed to, or transferred to this court, all attorneys, including government attorneys, shall file a written entry of appearance before addressing the court. Attorney Wolkiewicz does not have a Notice of Appearance on file in this case. (kdw)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 7, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Elizabeth M Skeen. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 20-418-GCS. Consent due by 5/28/2020 (kdw)
May 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Connie J Ernst, John Hickman, Robert Hickman ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-4174570.), filed by Elizabeth M Skeen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Summons Connie J. Ernst, #11 Summons John Hickman, #12 Summons Robert Hickman, #13 Request for Appointment of Process Server, #14 Request for Appointment of Special Process Server)(Wolkiewicz, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Skeen v. Ernst et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Hickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Hickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie J Ernst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth M Skeen
Represented By: Andrew V. Wolkiewicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?