Blanchard v. Good Samaritan Hospital Physician Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: EVELYN M BLANCHARD
Defendant: GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL PHYSICIAN SERVICES, INC.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00476
Filed: May 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gilbert C Sison
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint on or before August 3, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison on 6/26/2020. (kll)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 26, 2020 Filing 12 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Good Samaritan Hospital Physician Services, Inc.. (Dycus, Thomas)
June 26, 2020 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Good Samaritan Hospital Physician Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Good Samaritan Hospital for Good Samaritan Hospital Physician Services, Inc.. (Dycus, Thomas)
June 26, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Graham Dycus on behalf of Good Samaritan Hospital Physician Services, Inc. (Dycus, Thomas)
June 26, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing Good Samaritan Hospital Physician Services, Inc. to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to Good Samaritan Hospital Physician Services, Inc. on 06/26/2020. Consent due by 7/17/2020 (kdw)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Dycus on behalf of Good Samaritan Hospital Physician Services, Inc. (kdw)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 25, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Thomas Graham Dycus $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4212930 by on behalf of Good Samaritan Hospital Physician Services, Inc.. (Dycus, Thomas)
June 24, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF MODIFICATION re #5 Summons Returned Executed filed by Evelyn M Blanchard.Incorrect event selected. Select the event that most closely matches the document being filed. For this document, the correct event is "Return of Service Executed" under the heading "Initial Pleadings and Service/Service of Process". Docket text modified to reflect the correct document. No further action is required by the filer in relation to this notification. (kdw)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 23, 2020 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed by Evelyn M Blanchard. Good Samaritan Hospital Physician Services, Inc. served on 6/11/2020, answer due 7/2/2020. (Johnson, Mark) Modified on 6/24/2020 (kdw).
June 8, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Good Samaritan Hospital Physician Services, Inc. Original mailed to Attorney Mark S. Johnson. (ack)
May 26, 2020 Filing 3 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Johnson, Mark)
May 22, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: EVELYN M BLANCHARD. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 20-476-GCS. Consent due by 6/12/2020 (ack)
May 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR RETALIATORY DISCHARGE against GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL PHYSICIAN SERVICES, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-4186690.), filed by EVELYN M BLANCHARD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A, #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet CIVIL COVER SHEET, #4 Summons SUMMONS)(Johnson, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blanchard v. Good Samaritan Hospital Physician Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL PHYSICIAN SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: Thomas Graham Dycus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EVELYN M BLANCHARD
Represented By: Mark S. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?