Sturgeon v. Woodford County, IL Jail et al
Plaintiff: David M. Sturgeon
Defendant: Graham Correctional Center, Mason County, IL Jail and Woodford County, IL Jail
Case Number: 3:2020cv00492
Filed: May 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Rosenstengel
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2020 Filing 14 Initial Prisoner Filing Fee: $ 11.84 received, receipt number 34625102869 (ack)
July 14, 2020 Case transferred from Illinois Southern has been opened in CENTRAL DISTRICT OF ILLINOIS as case 1:20-cv-01265, filed 07/14/2020. (rah)
July 14, 2020 Filing 13 Case was electronically transferred to the Central District of Illinois. (jsm2)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO OTHER DISTRICT: Case transferred to United States District Court for the Central District of Illinois.. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 7/13/2020. (anp)
July 8, 2020 Filing 11 SUPPLEMENT by David M. Sturgeon. Supplement to #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (jsm2)
July 8, 2020 Filing 10 EXHIBIT by David M. Sturgeon. Exhibit to #1 Complaint. (jsm2)
June 29, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #8 Order,. (tjk)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ENTRY STRICKEN: Petitioner is ORDERED to provide the Court with the $5.00 filing fee or a properly completed IFP Motion on or before July 13, 2020. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send Petitioner an additional copy of the form IFP Motion. Failure to comply with this Order will result in dismissal of this action for want of prosecution and/or for failure to comply with a court order under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). (Action due by 7/13/2020). Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 6/29/2020. (tjk) Modified on 6/29/2020 (tjk).
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis ("IFP") (Doc. #6 ). Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(b)(1), Plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $3.41. The agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to forward the initial partial filing fee from Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of Court upon receipt of this Order. Plaintiff shall make monthly payments of 20% of the preceding month's income credited to Plaintiff's prison trust fund account (including all deposits to the inmate account from any source) until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The agency having custody of Plaintiff shall forward payments from Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of this Court each time the amount in the account exceeds $10 until the $350.00 filing fee is paid.In addition, Plaintiff shall note that the filing fees for multiple cases cumulate. See Newlin v. Helman, 123 F.3d 429, 436 (7th Cir. 1997), overruled in part on other grounds by Lee v. Clinton, 209 F.3d 1025 (7th Cir. 2000); Walker v. O'Brien, 216 F.3d 626 (7th Cir. 2000). A prisoner who files one suit must remit 20% of his monthly income to the Clerk of the Court until his fees have been paid; a prisoner who files a second suit or an appeal must remit 40%; and so on. Newlin, 123 F.3d at 436. "Five suits or appeals mean that the prisoner's entire monthly income must be turned over to the court until the fees have been paid." Id. Payments shall be mailed to: Clerk of the Court, United States District Court for the Southern District of Illinois, 750 Missouri Avenue, East St. Louis, Illinois 62201. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send a copy of this Order to the Trust Fund Officer at the Graham Correctional Center upon entry of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 6/10/2020. (tjk)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 9, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by David M. Sturgeon. (jsm2)
June 9, 2020 Filing 5 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (jsm2)
June 9, 2020 Filing 4 EXHIBIT by David M. Sturgeon. Exhibit to #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(jsm2)
May 29, 2020 Action due by 6/29/2020, per Order at Doc. 2. (kls3)
May 28, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing Plaintiff to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to Plaintiff on 05/28/2020. Consent due by 6/18/2020. (jsm2)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE AND ORDER: The Court has received your Complaint. Your case number is 20-cv-492-NJR. Within 30 days of the entry of this Order, you are ORDERED to submit the $400.00 filing fee or a motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee. If you file a motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee, the Court must review your trust fund account statement for the six-month period immediately preceding the filing of this action. Thus, you must have the Trust Fund Officer at your facility complete the attached certification and provide a copy of your trust fund account statement (or institutional equivalent). If you fail to pay the filing fee or submit the motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee by the deadline, the case will be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. FED. R. CIV. P. 41(b); Sperow v. Melvin, 153 F.3d 780, 781 (7th Cir. 1998). All mail should be sent to: Clerk's Office, U.S. District Court, 750 Missouri Avenue, East St. Louis, IL 62201. Finally, you are advised that if your address changes, you must notify the Court within seven days of the change by filing a Notice of Change of Address. Failure to do so could result in the dismissal of your case. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 5/28/2020. (jsm2)
May 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by David M. Sturgeon.(jsm2)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sturgeon v. Woodford County, IL Jail et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David M. Sturgeon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Graham Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mason County, IL Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Woodford County, IL Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?