Baker v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: William A. Baker
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSAOGC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00509
Filed: June 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Office: East St. Louis Office
Presiding Judge: Reona J Daly
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF REFERRAL: Upon consent of parties case transferred to Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly for final disposition. Judge J. Phil Gilbert no longer assigned to the case. (tba)
July 9, 2020 Filing 12 FINAL CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Garrison, Suzanne) Modified on 7/10/2020 (tba).
July 9, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Suzanne M. Garrison on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Garrison, Suzanne)
June 4, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security and original mailed to Attorney Camp. (kdw)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, granting #7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by William A. Baker. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 6/3/2020. (jdh)
June 3, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by William A. Baker. Document is duplicative of the Motion filed at Doc. 7. (tba)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 2, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by William A. Baker. (Camp, David)
June 2, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE REGARDING FILING re #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by William A. Baker. The Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is a fillable document. Fillable documents should be converted to non-fillable PDF before filing on CM/ECF.(tba)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 2, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert and Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly assigned. All future documents must bear case number 20-cv-509-JPG-RJD. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (tba)
June 1, 2020 Filing 4 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Camp, David)
June 1, 2020 Filing 3 STRICKEN MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by William A. Baker. (Camp, David) Modified on 6/3/2020 (tba).
June 1, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by David D. Camp on behalf of William A. Baker (Camp, David)
June 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by William A. Baker. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Camp, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William A. Baker
Represented By: David D. Camp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Suzanne M. Garrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSAOGC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?