McReaken v. Champion Home Builders, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Timothy W McReaken
Defendant: Champion Home Builders, Inc., Southeastern Homes, Main Street Mobile Home and KKN Main Street Mobile, Inc
Case Number: 3:2020cv00521
Filed: June 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gilbert C Sison
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 15:2301
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE to Motion re #15 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Champion Home Builders, Inc.. (Thomas, William)
July 1, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE to Motion re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Counts III and IV of Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed by Timothy W McReaken. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Stone, Stephen)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Counts III and IV of Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison on 6/18/2020. (klh)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 17, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Counts III and IV of Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by Timothy W McReaken. (Stone, Stephen)
June 12, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Timothy W McReaken. Responses due by 7/16/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit 1)(Stone, Stephen)
June 11, 2020 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Counts III and IV of Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed by Champion Home Builders, Inc.. (Thomas, William)
June 11, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Counts III and IV of Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by Champion Home Builders, Inc.. Responses due by 7/16/2020 (Thomas, William)
June 9, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE REGARDING FILING re #10 Consent/Non-Consent to US Magistrate Judge. The submitted Consent/Non-Consent form is a fillable document. Fillable documents should be converted to non-fillable PDF before filing on CM/ECF. This Notice is sent for informational purposes only. (tba)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 8, 2020 Filing 11 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Cerulo, Michael)
June 8, 2020 Filing 10 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Thomas, William)
June 5, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT to Removal by KKN Main Street Mobile, Inc. (Cerulo, Michael)
June 5, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael D. Cerulo on behalf of KKN Main Street Mobile, Inc (Cerulo, Michael)
June 4, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Stone, Stephen)
June 4, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen W. Stone on behalf of Timothy W McReaken (Stone, Stephen)
June 3, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ACTION. See Local Rule 83.1(f). In all cases filed in, removed to, or transferred to this court, all attorneys, including government attorneys, shall file a written entry of appearance before addressing the court. Attorneys Bradley, Stone and Cerulo do not have a Notice of Appearance on file in this case. (trb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 3, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Champion Home Builders, Inc., Timothy W McReaken and KKN Main Street Mobile, Inc . A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 20-521-GCS. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. Consent due by 6/24/2020 (trb)
June 3, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by William S. Thomas on behalf of Champion Home Builders, Inc. (Thomas, William)
June 3, 2020 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Champion Home Builders, Inc..(Thomas, William)
June 3, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Franklin County, IL, case number 2017-L-53 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-4195378), filed by Champion Home Builders, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet)(Thomas, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McReaken v. Champion Home Builders, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy W McReaken
Represented By: John E. Bradley
Represented By: Stephen W. Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Champion Home Builders, Inc.
Represented By: William S. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southeastern Homes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Main Street Mobile Home
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KKN Main Street Mobile, Inc
Represented By: Michael D. Cerulo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?