Vollmer v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Brian K. Vollmer
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSAOGC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00537
Filed: June 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Office: East St. Louis Office
Presiding Judge: Reona J Daly
Referring Judge: J Phil Gilbert
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Defendant shall file his answer and the administrative record by October 13, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly on 7/31/2020. (jmt)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 31, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Action due by 10/13/2020. (jmt)
July 30, 2020 Filing 12 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Unopposed) by Commissioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Schwartz, Alison)
July 30, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Alison Schwartz on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Schwartz, Alison)
June 23, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF REFERRAL: Upon consent of parties case transferred to Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly for final disposition. Judge J. Phil Gilbert no longer assigned to the case. (ack)
June 22, 2020 Filing 9 FINAL CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Garrison, Suzanne) Modified on 6/23/2020 (ack).
June 22, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Suzanne M. Garrison on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Garrison, Suzanne)
June 11, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security. (cds)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, granting #3 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Brian K. Vollmer. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 6/9/2020. (jdh)
June 8, 2020 Filing 5 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Severs, Traci)
June 8, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert and Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly assigned. All future documents must bear case number 20-cv-537-JPG-RJD. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (cds)
June 7, 2020 Filing 3 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Brian K. Vollmer. (Severs, Traci)
June 7, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Traci L. Severs on behalf of Brian K. Vollmer (Severs, Traci)
June 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Brian K. Vollmer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Commissioner of SSA)(Severs, Traci)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vollmer v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Suzanne M. Garrison
Represented By: Alison Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSAOGC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian K. Vollmer
Represented By: Traci L. Severs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?