Julius v. Deloitte Consulting LLP
Plaintiff: Briana Julius
Defendant: Deloitte Consulting LLP
Case Number: 3:2020cv00542
Filed: June 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Reona J Daly
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2020 Filing 9 JUDGMENT IN A CIVIL CASE. Approved by Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly on 6/30/2020. (jlm)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: A Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (Doc. 7) was filed by Plaintiff on June 26, 2020. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i), a plaintiff may dismiss an action without a court order by filing a notice of dismissal before the opposing party serves either an answer or a motion for summary judgment. Defendant has not filed an answer or motion for summary judgment and Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal appears proper under 41(a)(1)(A)(i). The Court therefore accepts Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (Doc. 7) and DISMISSES this action WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment and close this case accordingly. Signed by Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly on 6/30/2020. (nmf)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 26, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Briana Julius (Yiatras, Tiffany)
June 9, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Deloitte Consulting LLP. Original mailed to Attorney Yiatras. (lmb)
June 9, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Briana Julius. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 20-542-RJD. Consent due by 6/30/2020 (lmb)
June 8, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Francis (Casey) J. Flynn on behalf of Briana Julius (Flynn, Francis (Casey))
June 8, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Requested. (Yiatras, Tiffany)
June 8, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Tiffany Marko Yiatras on behalf of Briana Julius (Yiatras, Tiffany)
June 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Deloitte Consulting LLP ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-4198668.), filed by Briana Julius. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Yiatras, Tiffany)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Julius v. Deloitte Consulting LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deloitte Consulting LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Briana Julius
Represented By: Francis (Casey) J. Flynn
Represented By: Tiffany Marko Yiatras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?