Sanders v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Bobbi M. Sanders
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSAOGC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00561
Filed: June 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Mark A Beatty
Referring Judge: J Phil Gilbert
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2020 Filing 16 RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED by Bobbi M. Sanders on 7/13/20. (Schultz, Barry)
July 29, 2020 Filing 15 RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED by Bobbi M. Sanders on 7/10/20. (Schultz, Barry)
July 29, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bobbi M. Sanders. Commissioner of Social Security served on 7/10/2020, answer due 9/8/2020. (Schultz, Barry)
July 23, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF REFERRAL: Upon consent of parties case transferred to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty for final disposition. Judge J. Phil Gilbert no longer assigned to the case. (kdw)
July 22, 2020 Filing 12 FINAL CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Garrison, Suzanne) Modified on 7/23/2020 (kdw).
July 22, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Suzanne M. Garrison on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Garrison, Suzanne)
June 26, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #8 Consent/Non-Consent to US Magistrate Judge. The Clerk's Office received your Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form. The form is incomplete. Your signature was absent from the form. Therefore, the pleading is STRICKEN. Fully executed document has been refiled at document #9 , so no further action is required. (kdw)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 25, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Schultz, Barry)
June 25, 2020 Filing 8 STRICKEN CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Schultz, Barry) Modified on 6/26/2020 (kdw).
June 18, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security with original copy mailed to Attorney Schultz. (mar)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, granting #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Bobbi M. Sanders. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 6/16/2020. (jdh)
June 15, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF MODIFICATION re #1 Complaint filed by Bobbi M. Sanders. Text entry modified to reflect the proper defendant. No further action is required by the filer in relation to this notification. (kls3)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 15, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert and Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty assigned. All future documents must bear case number 3:20-cv-561-JPG-MAB. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (kls3)
June 13, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Bobbi M Sanders. (Schultz, Barry)
June 13, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Barry A. Schultz on behalf of Bobbi M Sanders (Schultz, Barry)
June 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Bobbi M Sanders. (Attachments: #1 ALJ decision, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Schultz, Barry) Modified on 6/15/2020 (kls3).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanders v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobbi M. Sanders
Represented By: Barry A. Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSAOGC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Suzanne M. Garrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?