Freestone v. Outsource, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Brenda Freestone
Defendant: Sparta Community Hospital and Outsource, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00582
Filed: June 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Staci M Yandle
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Mary Carolyn Turke on behalf of Plaintiff. (lmb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 21, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Mary Carolyn Turke $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4233535 by on behalf of Brenda Freestone. (Turke, Mary)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. The First Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer (Doc. #9 ) is GRANTED. Defendant Sparta Community Hospital shall file an Answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before 9/4/2020. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 7/14/2020. (dah)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 13, 2020 Filing 9 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Sparta Community Hospital. (Donnelly, Quinn)
July 13, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Quinn Patrick Donnelly on behalf of All Defendants (Donnelly, Quinn)
June 23, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TERMINATING JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, and a request for reassignment having been received, this case, in its entirety, is hereby reassigned to Judge Staci M. Yandle for further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty no longer assigned to the case. All future documents must bear case number 20-582-SMY. (lmb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 22, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Toops, Lynn)
June 18, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Sparta Community Hospital and original mailed to Attorney Toops. (kek)
June 18, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Outsource, Inc. and original mailed to Attorney Toops. (kek)
June 18, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Brenda Freestone. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 20-cv-582-MAB. Consent due by 7/9/2020 (kek)
June 17, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Lynn A Toops on behalf of Brenda Freestone (Toops, Lynn)
June 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-4206536.), filed by Brenda Freestone. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Toops, Lynn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freestone v. Outsource, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sparta Community Hospital
Represented By: Quinn Patrick Donnelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Outsource, Inc.
Represented By: Quinn Patrick Donnelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Freestone
Represented By: Lynn A Toops
Represented By: Mary Carolyn Turke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?