Jennings v. U.S. Bank National Association
Plaintiff: Claudia D Jennings
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Case Number: 3:2020cv00588
Filed: June 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Staci M Yandle
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Doc. #15 ). Answers due by August 24, 2020. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 7/22/2020. (sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 21, 2020 Filing 15 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by U.S. Bank National Association. (Sawyer, Ryan)
July 13, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE TERMINATING JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, and a request for reassignment having been received, this case, in its entirety, is hereby reassigned to Judge Staci M. Yandle for further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison no longer assigned to the case. All future documents must bear case number 20-588-SMY. (trb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 10, 2020 Filing 13 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Sawyer, Ryan)
July 1, 2020 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by U.S. Bank National Association. (Sawyer, Ryan)
July 1, 2020 Filing 11 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Wilson, Robert)
June 25, 2020 Filing 10 JURISDICTIONAL MEMORANDUM by U.S. Bank National Association. Regarding 7 Order,,, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Sawyer, Ryan)
June 23, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas D. O'Conner on behalf of U.S. Bank National Association (O'Conner, Nicholas)
June 23, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Aaron Sawyer on behalf of U.S. Bank National Association (Sawyer, Ryan)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER for Jurisdictional Memorandum re #1 Notice of Removal. Defendant U.S. Bank National Association's notice of removal (Doc. #1 ) alleges, upon information and belief, that Plaintiff Claudia D. Jennings is a citizen of Illinois, which is insufficient to establish federal diversity jurisdiction. Jurisdictional allegations must be based upon personal knowledge, not on information and belief. See, e.g., America's Best Inns, Inc. v. Best Inns of Abilene, L.P., 980 F.2d 1072, 1074 (7th Cir. 1992). Accordingly, U.S. Bank N.A. is DIRECTED to file a jurisdictional memorandum clearly alleging Plaintiff's citizenship on or before June 26, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison on 6/19/2020. (kll)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 19, 2020 Filing 6 EXHIBIT by U.S. Bank National Association. Exhibit to #1 Notice of Removal (Civil Cover Sheet). (Sargent, Douglas)
June 19, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ACTION re #1 Notice of Removal filed by U.S. Bank National Association. The Civil Cover Sheet was not filed as an attachment to the Complaint as instructed. The Civil Cover sheet must be filed using the event found under Civil > Other Documents > Exhibit and linked back to the Complaint docket entry. In addition the document attached at doc #3 Notice (Other) filed by U.S. Bank National Association contains a Notice of Filing. Notices of Filing and Certificates of Service should only be filed as the final page of a pleading, and not a standalone document. No further action regarding document 3 needed. (kdw)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 19, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Claudia D Jennings and U.S. Bank National Association. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 20-588-GCS. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. Consent due by 7/10/2020 (kdw)
June 18, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by U.S. Bank National Association re #1 Notice of Removal (Certificate of Filing) (Sargent, Douglas)
June 18, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas R Sargent on behalf of U.S. Bank National Association (Sargent, Douglas)
June 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Saline County, case number 2020L15 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-4207488), filed by U.S. Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Sargent, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jennings v. U.S. Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudia D Jennings
Represented By: Robert C. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Douglas R Sargent
Represented By: Nicholas D. O'Conner
Represented By: Ryan Aaron Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?