Miller v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Gwendolyn L Miller
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSAOGC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00606
Filed: June 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: J Phil Gilbert
Referring Judge: Gilbert C Sison
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security. Original mailed to Attorney Barry A. Schultz. (ack)
August 6, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Requested. (Schultz, Barry)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, granting #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Gwendolyn L Miller. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 6/29/2020. (jdh)
June 24, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF MODIFICATION re #1 Complaint filed by Gwendolyn L Miller. Complaint is listed against the incorrect party, SSAOGC. Correct party should be Commissioner of Social Security. Docket entry has been modified to list the correct party. No further action is required by the filer in relation to this notification. (tba)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 24, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert and Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison assigned. All future documents must bear case number 20-cv-606-JPG-GCS. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (tba)
June 23, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Gwendolyn L Miller. (Schultz, Barry)
June 23, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Barry A. Schultz on behalf of Gwendolyn L Miller (Schultz, Barry)
June 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Gwendolyn L Miller. (Attachments: #1 AC decision, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schultz, Barry) Modified on 6/24/2020 (tba).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSAOGC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gwendolyn L Miller
Represented By: Barry A. Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?