Butler v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Benjamin J Butler, Jr
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSAOGC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00608
Filed: June 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Mark A Beatty
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF REFERRAL: Upon consent of parties case transferred to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty for final disposition. Judge J. Phil Gilbert no longer assigned to the case. (trb)
July 10, 2020 Filing 11 FINAL CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Garrison, Suzanne)unseaed on 7/13/2020 (trb).
July 10, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Suzanne M. Garrison on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Garrison, Suzanne)
June 30, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security and original mailed to Attorney Severs. (kek)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, granting #3 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Benjamin J Butler, Jr. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 6/29/2020. (jdh)
June 25, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Severs, Traci) unsealed on 7/13/2020 (trb).
June 25, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #5 Consent/Non-Consent to US Magistrate Judge. The form is incomplete. It fails to list the signature for the party or Attorney who is consenting or not consenting to magistrate judge jurisdiction. Without a signature the form is insufficient. Therefore, the pleading is STRICKEN. Another form is attached to this Notice. The form should be re-filed as soon as possible. Under Signature of Party or Attorney you must sign the form for the party that is consenting or not consenting to magistrate judge jurisdiction. (kdw)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 24, 2020 Filing 5 STRICKEN CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Severs, Traci) Modified on 6/25/2020 (kdw).
June 24, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert and Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty assigned. All future documents must bear case number 20-608-JPG-MAB. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (kdw)
June 23, 2020 Filing 3 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Benjamin J Butler, Jr. (Severs, Traci)
June 23, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Traci L. Severs on behalf of Benjamin J Butler, Jr (Severs, Traci)
June 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Benjamin J Butler, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Commissioner of Social Security)(Severs, Traci)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Butler v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin J Butler, Jr
Represented By: Traci L. Severs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSAOGC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Suzanne M. Garrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?