Durham v Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: IRIS J. DURHAM
Defendant: ANDREW M. SAUL and Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSAOGC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00623
Filed: June 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Office: East St. Louis Office
Presiding Judge: Reona J Daly
Referring Judge: J Phil Gilbert
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Garrison, Suzanne)
July 24, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Suzanne M. Garrison on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Garrison, Suzanne)
July 2, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security. original mailed to Plaintiff for service. (amv)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, granting #2 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Iris J. Durham. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 6/30/2020. (jdh)
June 29, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF MODIFICATION re #1 Complaint, filed by Iris J. Durham, #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Iris J. Durham, #3 Notice of Appearance filed by Iris J. Durham. Modifications made to text entries to correct proper party defendant's name and reference to parties. No further action is required by the filer in relation to this notification. (kls3)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 26, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert and Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly assigned. All future documents must bear case number 3:20-cv-623-JPG-RJD. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (kls3)
June 26, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew F. Richter on behalf of Iris J. Dunham (Richter, Matthew). Modified on 6/29/2020 (kls3).
June 26, 2020 Filing 2 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Iris J. Dunham. (Richter, Matthew) Modified on 6/29/2020 (kls3).
June 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Iris J. Dunham. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 USM 285- U.S. Attorney General, #6 USM 285- U.S. Attorney S.D. ILL, #7 USM 285- SSA OGC)(Richter, Matthew) Modified on 6/29/2020 (kls3).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Durham v Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IRIS J. DURHAM
Represented By: Matthew F. Richter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW M. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Suzanne M. Garrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSAOGC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?