Galindez v. Ahmed et al
Plaintiff: Angel Enrique Romero Galindez
Defendant: K. Schneider, Faisal Ahmed and Federal Bureau of Prisons
Case Number: 3:2020cv00655
Filed: July 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: J Phil Gilbert
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: Defendants are hereby ORDERED to file a written response to Plaintiff's #22 Motion for Preliminary Injunction on or before September 17, 2020. In addition to responding to the claim that Dr. Ahmed has continued to deny Plaintiff treatment for extreme pain caused by a metal rod and screw that remain improperly placed in his left leg, Defendants should also address Plaintiff's need for a translator in the event a hearing is scheduled to address the motion (as referenced in Doc. 22-1). The Court will determine whether a hearing on the pending motion is necessary after responses are filed. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 9/3/2020. (jsy) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Angel Enrique Romero Galindez. (Attachments: #1 Informative Motion)(jaj)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED as to USAO on 8/17/2020. (tjk)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED on 8/18/2020. (tjk)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Initial Prisoner Filing Fee: $31.65 received, receipt number 34625103228 (rah)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (amv)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE: Angel Enrique Romero Galindez was directed to file the attached form regarding consenting or declining to consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction. The time for doing so has now passed, and the Court has not received the form. As required by Administrative Order No. 257, Angel Enrique Romero Galindez shall return the form within 7 days or face possible sanctions. The Clerk notes that due to the COVID-19 public health crisis, deadlines that were pending on or before April 1, 2020 were extended in accord with Administrative Order No. 261 and/or Amended Administrative Order No. 261. This automated notice does not take into account any such extensions. If, after the expiration of the 7-day deadline set forth herein, the Court chooses to take further action, all applicable deadline extensions will be considered at that time. Consent due by 8/4/2020. (rah)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SUPPLEMENT by Angel Enrique Romero Galindez. Supplement to #1 Complaint. (jaj)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Summons Issued as to K. Schneider. (jaj)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Faisal Ahmed. (jaj)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 HIPAA Qualified Protective Order. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 7/27/2020. (jaj)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS on Defendants AHMED and SCHNEIDER. The #1 Complaint survives review under 28 U.S.C. 1915A. COUNT 1 will proceed against AHMED and SCHNEIDER and is DISMISSED with prejudice against FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS. Plaintiff's #4 Motion for Attorney Representation is DENIED. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to TERMINATE Defendant FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS as a party in CM/ECF and ENTER the standard qualified protective order pursuant to the Health Insurance Portability and Accountability Act. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 7/24/2020. (jsy)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Consent Form - IFP Proceedings by Angel Enrique Romero Galindez. (jaj)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Galindez, granting #3 filed by Angel Enrique Romero Galindez. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to mail a copy of this Memorandum and Order to Plaintiff. Upon receipt of Plaintiff's signed consent form, the Clerk shall mail a copy of this Memorandum and Order and an executed copy of the consent form to the Warden at Greenville Federal Correctional Institution, as well as e-mail a copy of this Memorandum and Order and an executed copy of the consent form to the Trust Fund Management Staff at Greenville Federal Correctional Institution. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 7/15/2020. (tjk)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing Plaintiff. to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to Plaintiff. on 07/06/2020. Consent due by 7/27/2020.(jsm2)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE AND ORDER: This Court has received your complaint and your motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee from the Northern District of Illinois, previously assigned case number: 20-cv-3859. Your new case number is 20-cv-655-JPG. The following is some information you should know regarding the initial stages of your lawsuit. After your filing fee status is determined, the Court will your complaint to identify legally sufficient claims and defendants and dismiss any legally insufficient claims. See: 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1915A. The Court will conduct this review within the next 60 days and inform you of the findings in a Merit Review Order. No other action will be taken in your case during this time, absent extraordinary circumstances. Therefore, you do not need to submit any evidence, argument, motions, or other documents. If you filed a motion for recruitment of counsel along with your complaint, it will not be considered until the merit review is complete. Please note that any motion for recruitment of counsel must include evidence of your own efforts to find counsel, such as a list of the attorneys you contacted and copies of letters you sent or received. See Pruitt v. Mote, 503 F.3d 647, 654-55 (7th Cir. 2007). If you do not receive a Merit Review Order within the next 60 days, you may file a motion requesting the status of your case. In the event your claim(s) survive the merit review, further information and instruction will be provided to you at that time. In addition, several administrative matters warrant mention. Any communication directed to the Court should be in the form of a motion or other pleading and not a letter. All mail should be sent to: Clerk's Office, U.S. District Court, 750 Missouri Avenue, East St. Louis, IL 62201. Finally, you are advised that if your address changes, you must notify the Court within seven days of the change by filing a Notice of Change of Address. Failure to do so could result in the dismissal of your case. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 7/6/2020. (jsm2)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:20-cv-03859. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TRANSFERRED to the USDC Southern District of Illinois the electronic record. (ec, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 7/6/2020.]
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order signed by the Honorable Gary Feinerman on 7/6/2020: For the reasons set forth below, this case is transferred to the Southern District of Illinois under 28 U.S.C. 1406(a) or, in the alternative, 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). The Clerk is directed to effectuate the transfer forthwith. All pending motions are terminated on this court's docket. Civil case transferred.Mailed notice.(jlj, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 7/6/2020.]
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order ***Civil Case Terminated. (jlj, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 7/6/2020.]
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION by Plaintiff Angel Enrique Romero Galindez for attorney representation. (Envelope postmarked 6/24/2020). (mc, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 7/6/2020.]
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Angel Enrique Romero Galindez for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (Exhibit) (Envelope postmarked 6/24/2020). (mc, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 7/6/2020.]
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet (mc, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 7/6/2020.]
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and no copies by Angel Enrique Romero Galindez. (Exhibit) (Envelope postmarked 6/24/2020). (mc, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 7/6/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Galindez v. Ahmed et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel Enrique Romero Galindez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Faisal Ahmed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Prisons
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?