Hutchcraft v. Kreiger
Plaintiff: Olivia Hutchcraft and Olivia N. Hutchcraft
Defendant: Kenzie Kreiger and Kenzie R. Kreiger
Case Number: 3:2020cv00671
Filed: July 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gilbert C Sison
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Status Conference set for 12/29/2020 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison. Instructions for the conference call are as follows: (1) call toll-free, 888-273-3658; (2) when prompted, enter the seven-digit Access Code: 5699758; (3) when prompted, enter the four-digit Security Code: 0671. (dmw2)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING AND DISCOVERY ORDER: Discovery due by 5/8/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 5/22/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison on 8/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Joint Report of Parties)(dmw2)
August 28, 2020 Filing 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 8/28/2020. Attorney Courtney Hughes present on behalf of Plaintiff. Attorney Michael Reda present on behalf of Defendant. The Joint Report of the Parties will be adopted. Should the parties seek to amend the trial date, a written motion will be required. If the parties find that a Settlement Conference would prove beneficial, they are instructed to file a joint motion requesting the same. A Status Conference will be set by separate Notice. (Court Reporter N/A.) (dmw2)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 8/28/2020 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison. Instructions for the conference call are as follows: (1) call toll-free, 888-273-3658; (2) when prompted, enter the seven-digit Access Code: 5699758; (3) when prompted, enter the four-digit Security Code: 0671. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison on 7/28/2020. (dmw2)
July 28, 2020 Filing 13 CJRA TRACK B assigned: Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/31/2021 at 1:30 PM and Presumptive Trial Month set for September, 2021 both in the East St. Louis Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison on 7/28/2020. (dmw2)
July 21, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE: All parties have consented to have a United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case. Accordingly, Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison is ASSIGNED to conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. All future documents must bear case number 20-671-GCS. Any District Judge previously assigned will no longer be assigned to this case. (trb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 21, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF MODIFICATION re #10 Notice (Other) filed by Olivia N. Hutchcraft. Incorrect event selected. Document text modified to show the correct event. No further action is required by the filer in relation to this notification. (trb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 20, 2020 Filing 10 FINAL CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Hughes, R.) unsealed on 7/21/2020 (trb).
July 20, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Reda, Michael) unsealed on 7/21/2020 (trb).
July 16, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Kenzie R. Kreiger.(Reda, Michael)
July 13, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE by Kenzie R. Kreiger of Filing Notice of Removal of Civil Action in State Court (Reda, Michael)
July 10, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing Olivia N. Hutchcraft to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to Olivia N. Hutchcraft on 7/10/2020. Consent due by 7/31/2020 (kls3)
July 10, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE REGARDING FILING: The Civil Cover Sheet submitted is a fillable document. Fillable documents should be converted to non-fillable PDF documents before filing on CM/ECF. This Notice is sent for informational purposes only. (kls3)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 10, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Kenzie R. Kreiger. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 3:20-cv-671-GCS. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. Consent due by 7/31/2020 (kls3)
July 9, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam S. McGonigle on behalf of Kenzie Kreiger (McGonigle, Adam)
July 9, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Reda on behalf of Kenzie Kreiger (Reda, Michael)
July 9, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Madison County Circuit Court, case number 2020-L-0771 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-4223144), filed by Kenzie Kreiger. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Reda, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hutchcraft v. Kreiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olivia Hutchcraft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olivia N. Hutchcraft
Represented By: R. Courtney Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenzie Kreiger
Represented By: Adam S. McGonigle
Represented By: Michael Reda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenzie R. Kreiger
Represented By: Adam S. McGonigle
Represented By: Michael Reda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?