Pace, M.D. v. Granite City Clinic Corporation
Plaintiff: Paul J. Pace, M.D.
Defendant: Granite City Clinic Corporation
Case Number: 3:2020cv00674
Filed: July 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Reona J Daly
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2020 Filing 26 Plaintiff's ANSWER to #14 Counterclaim by Paul J. Pace, M.D..(Lawson, William)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING #2 MOTION for Discovery Expedited Discovery filed by Paul J. Pace, M.D. Responses to written discovery shall be served by 8/25/2020. Depositions shall be completed by 10/12/2020. Status Conference set for 10/5/2020 at 10:00 AM via telephone before Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly. The parties should call Judge Daly's conference line at 618-439-7731 to join the call. Signed by Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly on 8/11/2020. (nmf)
August 11, 2020 Filing 24 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly: Status Conference held on 8/11/2020. Attorney William Lawson for Plaintiff and Attorney Robert Burtker for Defendant. An order on the pending motion for expedited discovery to issue. (nmf)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: Due to a conflict with Plaintiff's counsel's schedule, the Status Conference set for 8/13/2020 is CANCELED and is RESET for 8/11/2020 at 9:30 AM via telephone before Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly. The parties should call Judge Daly's conference line at 618-439-7731 to join the call. Signed by Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly on 8/5/2020. (nmf)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: Status Conference set for 8/13/2020 at 9:30 AM via telephone before Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly. The parties should call Judge Daly's conference line at 618-439-7731 to join the call. The plan for the handling of the pending motions will be discussed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly on 8/5/2020. (nmf)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 5, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE: All parties have consented to have a United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case. Accordingly, Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly is ASSIGNED to conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. All future documents must bear case number 20-674-RJD. Any District Judge previously assigned will no longer be assigned to this case. (amv)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 4, 2020 Filing 20 FINAL CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Lawson, William)
August 4, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Granite City Clinic Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Burtker, Robert)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Robert S. Burtker on behalf of Defendant/Counter-Plaintiff Granite City Clinic Corporation. (kls3)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 3, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Admission by Attorney Robert S. Burtker $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4244763 by on behalf of Granite City Clinic Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Burtker, Robert)
August 3, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE: Paul J. Pace, M.D was directed to file the attached form regarding consenting or declining to consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction. The time for doing so has now passed, and the Court has not received the form. As required by Administrative Order No. 257, Paul J. Pace, M.D shall return the form within 7 days or face possible sanctions. The Clerk notes that due to the COVID-19 public health crisis, deadlines that were pending on or before April 1, 2020 were extended in accord with Administrative Order No. 261 and/or Amended Administrative Order No. 261. This automated notice does not take into account any such extensions. If, after the expiration of the 7-day deadline set forth herein, the Court chooses to take further action, all applicable deadline extensions will be considered at that time. Consent due by 8/10/2020 (tba)
July 31, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE OF ACTION: Court Records indicate that Attorney Robert S. Burtker is not admitted to practice in the Southern District of Illinois; however it appears he was given CM/ECF credentials to file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Attorney Burtker needs to file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice to enter his/her appearance. Documentation and instructions for filing a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice can be found at the courts website at www.ilsd.uscourts.gov under Rules & Forms. (amv)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 30, 2020 Filing 14 COUNTERCLAIM for Declaratory Judgment and Answer to Complaint for Declaratory Judgment against Paul J. Pace, M.D., filed by Granite City Clinic Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(Burtker, Robert)
July 30, 2020 Filing 13 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Burtker, Robert)
July 29, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing Defendant Granite City to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to Defendant Granite City on 7/29/20. Consent due by 8/19/2020 (amv)
July 28, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert S. Burtker on behalf of Granite City Clinic Corporation (Burtker, Robert)
July 17, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Paul J. Pace, M.D.. Granite City Clinic Corporation served on 7/14/2020, answer due 8/4/2020. (Lawson, William)
July 17, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #8 Return of Service Executed filed by Paul J. Pace, M.D. Filer shall refile using proper event: Civil/ Initial Pleadings and Service/Service of Process/Summons Returned Executed. (amv)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 16, 2020 Filing 8 STRICKEN RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED by Paul J. Pace, M.D. on 07/14/2020. (Lawson, William) Modified on 7/17/2020 (amv).
July 10, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Granite City Clinic Corporation. Original mailed to counsel for plaintiff for service. (amv)
July 10, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Requested. (Lawson, William)
July 10, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Paul J. Pace, M.D.. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 20-674-RJD. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. Consent due by 7/31/2020 (amv)
July 9, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by William M. Lawson on behalf of Paul J. Pace, M.D. (Lawson, William)
July 9, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by Paul J. Pace, M.D. Notice of Intent to Use Process Server (Lawson, William)
July 9, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Discovery Expedited Discovery by Paul J. Pace, M.D.. (Lawson, William)
July 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Granite City Clinic Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-4224026.), filed by Paul J. Pace, M.D.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Lawson, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pace, M.D. v. Granite City Clinic Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul J. Pace, M.D.
Represented By: William M. Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Granite City Clinic Corporation
Represented By: Robert S. Burtker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?