Beccue v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Teresa D Beccue
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSAOGC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00692
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Mark A Beatty
Referring Judge: J Phil Gilbert
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Garrison, Suzanne)
August 10, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Suzanne M. Garrison on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Garrison, Suzanne)
July 17, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security. Original mailed to Attorney Schultz (lmb)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, granting #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Teresa D Beccue. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 7/16/2020. (jdh)
July 15, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert and Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty assigned. All future documents must bear case number 20-692-JPG-MAB. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (lmb)
July 15, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Teresa D Beccue. (Schultz, Barry)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Barry A. Schultz on behalf of Teresa D Beccue (Schultz, Barry)
July 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Teresa D Beccue. (Attachments: #1 AC decision, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Schultz, Barry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beccue v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Suzanne M. Garrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSAOGC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa D Beccue
Represented By: Barry A. Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?