Kelly v. White et al
Plaintiff: John J. Kelly
Defendant: Billy White, Kevin Kribbs, Alan Morris and Jaime Ramsey
Intervenor Defendant: City of Centralia
Case Number: 3:2020cv00703
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gilbert C Sison
Referring Judge: Staci M Yandle
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2020 Filing 13 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Approved by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 8/24/2020. (dah)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER. The Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. #3 ) is DENIED and the Complaint (Doc. #2 ) is DISMISSED with prejudice. The Motion for Recruitment of Counsel (Doc. #4 ) and Motion to Intervene (Doc. #7 ) are DENIED as MOOT. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 8/24/2020. (dah)
August 5, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT/REASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, this case will remain with the assigned District Judge Staci M. Yandle. This Notice does not alter any prior referrals of motions or matters pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636(b)(1-3). (kek)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 5, 2020 Filing 10 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (kek)
July 31, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #8 Notice Requesting Consent. Incorrect entry; entered in error. (kls3)
July 31, 2020 Filing 8 STRICKEN. NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing City of Centralia to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to City of Centralia on 7/31/2020. Consent due by 8/21/2020 (kls3) Modified on 7/31/2020 (kls3).
July 30, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Intervene by City of Centralia. (Gruenke, Douglas)
July 30, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas C. Gruenke on behalf of City of Centralia (Gruenke, Douglas)
July 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TERMINATING JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: This case has been reassigned to Judge Staci M. Yandle for further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison no longer assigned to the case. All future documents must bear case number 20-cv-703-SMY. (jlrr)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Recruitment of Counsel by John J. Kelly. (kdw)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by John J. Kelly. (kdw)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by John J. Kelly.(kdw)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: John J. Kelly. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 20-703-GCS. Refer to the pro se litigant guide, found on the ILSD website, for further information. Consent due by 8/7/2020 (kdw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelly v. White et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billy White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Kribbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaime Ramsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John J. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: City of Centralia
Represented By: Douglas C. Gruenke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?