Souvannasot v. President of Toyota Motor Company Sales USA Inc.
Plaintiff: Niyom Souvannasot
Defendant: President of Toyota Motor Company Sales USA Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00713
Filed: July 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Mark A Beatty
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: This case was transferred to the Northern District of Illinois, where it remains pending as case number 20-cv-4612. Therefore, Plaintiff must file all motions relating to this case in the Northern District of Illinois. The undersigned can no longer rule on motions filed by Plaintiff in this case. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to TERMINATE #12 Motion to Clarify, #13 Motion for Reconsideration, and #14 Motion for Reconsideration on the docket and to TRANSMIT these motions to the Northern District of Illinois. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 8/20/20. (klh2)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 20, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Reconsideration re 10 Order Transferring Case to Other District by Niyom Souvannasot. (kek)
August 20, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Reconsideration re 10 Order Transferring Case to Other District by Niyom Souvannasot. (kek)
August 17, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Clarify re 10 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO OTHER DISTRICT by Niyom Souvannasot. (kek)
August 6, 2020 Case transferred from Illinois Southern has been opened in Northern District of Illinois as case 1:20-cv-04612, filed 08/06/2020. (rah)
August 6, 2020 Filing 11 Case electronically transferred to the Northern District of Illinois. (kls3)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO OTHER DISTRICT: Plaintiff alleges that his 2008 Toyota Corolla repeatedly failed to start and underwent repairs seventeen times between February 2011 and April 2014 at St. Charles Toyota in St. Charles, Illinois and Thomas Toyota in Joliet, Illinois. After the last repair in April 2014, Plaintiff was charged approximately $600 for the repairs, even though, according to him, his car was still under warranty and should have been repaired at no charge. When he could not pay the $600 charge, the service manager at Thomas Toyota withheld his car and threatened to sell it. Ten days later, the general manager of the dealership gave Plaintiff's car back at no charge. Plaintiff is now suing the President of Toyota Motor Company for violations of the Magnuson Moss Warranty Act. To the extent that a viable and timely claim exists, Plaintiff does not demonstrate that the Southern District of Illinois is the proper forum for its resolution. This case has no apparent connection to this judicial district. Plaintiff lives in Joliet, Illinois and his claim is based on events that occurred there. Consequently, this case is TRANSFERRED to the Northern District of Illinois pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404. Resolution of Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. 5) and his motion for counsel (Doc. 3) are left for the transferee court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 8/5/20. (klh2)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 5, 2020 Filing 9 SUPPLEMENT to #2 Complaint by Niyom Souvannasot. (kek)
July 31, 2020 Filing 8 Letter received from Plaintiff (kek)
July 29, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (kek)
July 29, 2020 Filing 6 Letter received from Plaintiff (kek)
July 29, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Niyom Souvannasot. (kek)
July 22, 2020 Action due by 8/21/2020, per Doc. 4. (kls3)
July 22, 2020 Filing 4 Letter to Plaintiff re filing fee. (Attachments: #1 Motion for IFP). (jsm2)
July 22, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Niyom Souvannasot. (jsm2)
July 22, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against President of Toyota Motor Company Sales USA Inc., filed by Niyom Souvannasot. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope).(jsm2)
July 22, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent:. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 20-cv-713-MAB. Refer to pro see litigant guide found on the ILSD website, for further information. Consent due by 8/12/2020. (jsm2)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Souvannasot v. President of Toyota Motor Company Sales USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: President of Toyota Motor Company Sales USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Niyom Souvannasot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?