Winkle v. Stevens Trucking Company et al
Plaintiff: Preston WInkle
Defendant: Michael Amzy Gill, Stevens Trucking Company and Michael Gill
Case Number: 3:2020cv00771
Filed: August 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gilbert C Sison
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Filing 11 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Garwood, Robert)
September 4, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #9 Notice (Other) filed by Preston Winkle. The incorrect event was selected. Select the event that most closely matches the document being filed. For this document, the correct event is "Consent/Non-Consent to US Magistrate Judge" under the heading "Other Filings/Other Documents". Filer will need to re file the corrected document. (trb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 4, 2020 Filing 9 ENTRY STRICKEN :NOTICE by Preston Winkle Notice of Consent to Magistrate (Garwood, Robert) Modified on 9/4/2020 (trb).
September 4, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking 7 Notice (Other) filed by Preston Winkle. The form is incomplete. It fails to list which party is consenting or not consenting to magistrate judge jurisdiction. Signing the submitted by portion of the form is insufficient. Therefore, the pleading is STRICKEN. Another form is attached to this Notice. The form should be re-filed as soon as possible. Under Name of Party or Parties you must print the name of the party that is consenting or not consenting to magistrate judge jurisdiction. You should also sign the form under signature of party or attorney. In addition the incorrect event was selected. Select the event that most closely matches the document being filed. For this document, the correct event is "Consent/Non-Consent to US Magistrate Judge" under the heading "Other Filings/Other Documents". Filer will need to re file the corrected document. (kdw)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 1, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE: Preston Winkle was directed to file the attached form regarding consenting or declining to consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction. The time for doing so has now passed, and the Court has not received the form. As required by Administrative Order No. 257, Preston Winkle shall return the form within 7 days or face possible sanctions. The Clerk notes that due to the COVID-19 public health crisis, deadlines that were pending on or before April 1, 2020 were extended in accord with Administrative Order No. 261 and/or Amended Administrative Order No. 261. This automated notice does not take into account any such extensions. If, after the expiration of the 7-day deadline set forth herein, the Court chooses to take further action, all applicable deadline extensions will be considered at that time. Consent due by 9/8/2020 (trb)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert T. Garwood on behalf of Preston Winkle (Garwood, Robert)
August 10, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Michael Gill and Stevens Trucking Company summons returned to attorney for service. (trb)
August 10, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ACTION:In all cases filed in, removed to, or transferred to this court, all attorneys, including government attorneys, shall file a written entry of appearance before addressing the court. Attorney Garwood does not have a Notice of Appearance on file in this case. (trb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 10, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Preston WInkle. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 20-771-GCS. Consent due by 8/31/2020 (trb)
August 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-4249468.), filed by Preston WInkle. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Stevens Trucking Summons, #3 Summons Michael A. Gill)(Garwood, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Winkle v. Stevens Trucking Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Amzy Gill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stevens Trucking Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Gill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Preston WInkle
Represented By: Robert T. Garwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?