Greco v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Laura P. Greco
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSAOGC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00799
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Mark A Beatty
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF REFERRAL: Upon consent of parties case transferred to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty for final disposition. Judge J. Phil Gilbert no longer assigned to the case. (tba)
October 1, 2020 Filing 7 FINAL CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Garrison, Suzanne) Unsealed on 10/2/2020 (tba).
October 1, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Suzanne M. Garrison on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Garrison, Suzanne)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security. Original mailed to Attorney David D. Camp. (tba)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert and Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty assigned. All future documents must bear case number 20-cv-799-JPG-MAB. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (tba)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Camp, David)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by David D. Camp on behalf of Laura P. Greco (Camp, David)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-4257582.), filed by Laura P. Greco. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Camp, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greco v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Suzanne M. Garrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSAOGC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura P. Greco
Represented By: David D. Camp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?