Tessone v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Ricky Tessone
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSAOGC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00807
Filed: August 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Mark A Beatty
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF REFERRAL: Upon consent of parties case transferred to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty for final disposition. Judge J. Phil Gilbert no longer assigned to the case. (cds)
September 17, 2020 Filing 11 FINAL - CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Garrison, Suzanne) Modified on 9/18/2020 (cds).
September 17, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Suzanne M. Garrison on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Garrison, Suzanne)
September 8, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, and returned to Attorney Gaines for service. (kls3)
September 4, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Requested. (Gaines, Brent)
August 27, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Gaines, Brent)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, granting #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Ricky Tessone. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 8/24/2020. (jdh)
August 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking [1-2] Exhibit to Complaint filed by Ricky Tessone. Filer should refile document using the correct event which allows for sealing document. Document has been deleted. (lmb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert and Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty assigned. All future documents must bear case number 20-807-JPG-MAB. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (lmb)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Brent M. Gaines on behalf of Ricky Tessone (Gaines, Brent)
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ricky Tessone. (Gaines, Brent)
August 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Ricky Tessone. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Consent to Magistrate Judge)(Gaines, Brent)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tessone v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Suzanne M. Garrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSAOGC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky Tessone
Represented By: Brent M. Gaines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?