Mcintosh v. USAA General Indemnity Company et al
Plaintiff: Debra Mcintosh
Defendant: USAA Agency, Inc., USAA General Indemnity Company and USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv00816
Filed: August 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DENYING the litigants' #16 Stipulation to Bifurcate & Stay Discovery, construed as a motion under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42(b). Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 10/19/2020. (cab).
October 8, 2020 Filing 16 STIPULATION to Bifurcate and Stay Discovery on Claims for Bad Faith under Illinois Insurance Code 155 by All Defendants. (Morrissey, Anna)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING #11 Motion to Withdraw. Attorney Krysta K. Gumbiner terminated from the case. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 9/21/2020. (cab). THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 18, 2020 Filing 14 First MOTION to Remand by Debra Mcintosh. Responses due by 10/22/2020 (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support of Motion to Remand, #2 Order to Remand, #3 Supplement Order - Case Law)(May, Justin)
September 18, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin B. May on behalf of Debra Mcintosh (May, Justin)
September 17, 2020 Filing 12 CJRA TRACK B assigned: The Final Pretrial Conference is scheduled for 8/18/2021 at 9:00 AM with a Jury Trial date of 8/30/2021 at 9:00 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge J. Phil Gilbert. Parties are to submit a Joint Report regarding Proposed Scheduling and Discovery Order within 21 days of the entry of this filing. Scheduling/Discovery and Settlement Conferences will NOT be set for hearing unless requested by the parties or deemed necessary by the Court. (tag)
September 16, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by All Defendants. (Gumbiner, Krysta)
September 16, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE TERMINATING JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, and a request for reassignment having been received, this case, in its entirety, is hereby reassigned to Judge J. Phil Gilbert for further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison no longer assigned to the case. All future documents must bear case number 20-816-JPG. (ack)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 15, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Morrissey, Anna)
September 15, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Anna S. Morrissey on behalf of All Defendants (Morrissey, Anna)
September 15, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE: All Defendants were directed to file the attached form regarding consenting or declining to consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction. The time for doing so has now passed, and the Court has not received the form. As required by Administrative Order No. 257, All Defendants shall return the form within 7 days or face possible sanctions. The Clerk notes that due to the COVID-19 public health crisis, deadlines that were pending on or before April 1, 2020 were extended in accord with Administrative Order No. 261 and/or Amended Administrative Order No. 261. This automated notice does not take into account any such extensions. If, after the expiration of the 7-day deadline set forth herein, the Court chooses to take further action, all applicable deadline extensions will be considered at that time. Consent due by 9/22/2020 (ack)
August 28, 2020 Filing 6 USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANYS ANSWER to Complaint and AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by All Defendants.(Gumbiner, Krysta)
August 28, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE by All Defendants re #1 Notice of Removal, NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENT TO STATE COURT RECORD (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Agreed Order of Dismissal)(Gumbiner, Krysta)
August 24, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: All Defendants. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 20-816-GCS. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. Consent due by 9/14/2020 (ack) Modified to reflect only defendants consent is due. (jlrr).
August 21, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by All Defendants. (Gumbiner, Krysta)
August 21, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Krysta K. Gumbiner on behalf of All Defendants (Gumbiner, Krysta)
August 21, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Williamson County Circuit Court, case number 2020L79 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-4261650), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gumbiner, Krysta)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mcintosh v. USAA General Indemnity Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Mcintosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA Agency, Inc.
Represented By: Krysta K. Gumbiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA General Indemnity Company
Represented By: Krysta K. Gumbiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Krysta K. Gumbiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?