Federal Insurance Company v. Market Street Bancshares, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Federal Insurance Company
Defendant: Market Street Bancshares, Inc., Robert L. Newman, PEOPLES NATIONAL BANK, N.A. a/k/a PEOPLES NATIONAL BANK OF MCLEANSBORO, Terry A. Newman, Peoples National Bank, N.A. and Peoples National Bank of McLeansboro
Case Number: 3:2020cv00818
Filed: August 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Stephen P McGlynn
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 11/16/2020 at 10:00 AM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Judge Stephen P. McGlynn. Instructions to join the phone conference are as follows: Call toll free 1-888-684-8852, when prompted enter access code 6102338, when prompted enter the four-digit security code 9374. Signed by Judge Stephen P. McGlynn on 10/14/2020. (jsm2)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #29 Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Report of Parties and Proposed Scheduling and Discovery Order. In light of reassignment to Judge McGlynn as well as pursuant to Local Rule 16.2(a) and Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 16(b) & 26(f), this matter will be set for hearing at a later date. Signed by Judge Stephen P. McGlynn on 10/13/2020. (jce) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 12, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION for Extension of Time to File JOINT REPORT OF PARTIES AND PROPOSED SCHEDULING AND DISCOVERY ORDER by Federal Insurance Company. (Calov, Kaitlin)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Stephen P. McGlynn for all further proceedings. Judge J. Phil Gilbert no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 10/5/2020. (jdh)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 21, 2020 Filing 27 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Federal Insurance Company. Market Street Bancshares, Inc. waiver sent on 9/1/2020, answer due 11/2/2020. (Calov, Kaitlin)
September 21, 2020 Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Federal Insurance Company. Peoples National Bank, N.A. waiver sent on 9/1/2020, answer due 11/2/2020. (Calov, Kaitlin)
September 21, 2020 Filing 25 CJRA TRACK B assigned: Final Pretrial Conference is scheduled for 9/22/2021 at 9:00 AM with a Bench Trial date of 10/4/2021 at 9:00 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge J. Phil Gilbert. Parties are to submit a Joint Report regarding Proposed Scheduling and Discovery Order within 21 days of the entry of this filing. Scheduling/Discovery and Settlement Conferences will NOT be set for hearing unless requested by the parties or deemed necessary by the Court. (tag)
September 21, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE TERMINATING JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, and a request for reassignment having been received, this case, in its entirety, is hereby reassigned to Judge J. Phil Gilbert for further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly no longer assigned to the case. All future documents must bear case number 20-818-JPG. (kdw)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 21, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE OF MODIFICATION re 21 Notice (Other) filed by Federal Insurance Company. Incorrect event selected. Select the event that most closely matches the document being filed. For this document, the correct event is "Consent/Non-Consent to US Magistrate Judge" under the heading "Other Filings/ Other Documents". Docket text modified to reflect the correct document. No further action required by the filer.(kdw)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 18, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by William R. Tapella, II on behalf of Robert L. Newman, Terry A. Newman (Tapella, William)
September 16, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE: Federal Insurance Company was directed to file the attached form regarding consenting or declining to consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction. The time for doing so has now passed, and the Court has not received the form. As required by Administrative Order No. 257, Federal Insurance Company shall return the form within 7 days or face possible sanctions. The Clerk notes that due to the COVID-19 public health crisis, deadlines that were pending on or before April 1, 2020 were extended in accord with Administrative Order No. 261 and/or Amended Administrative Order No. 261. This automated notice does not take into account any such extensions. If, after the expiration of the 7-day deadline set forth herein, the Court chooses to take further action, all applicable deadline extensions will be considered at that time. Consent due by 9/23/2020 (kdw)
September 14, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #15 and #16 Waiver of Service Executed filed by Federal Insurance Company. The waiver sent dates are still incorrect. E-filer is instructed to re-file with the correct dates in order to properly trigger the answer due deadline. (kdw)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 11, 2020 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Federal Insurance Company. Terry A. Newman waiver sent on 8/25/2020, answer due 10/26/2020. (Calov, Kaitlin)
September 11, 2020 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Federal Insurance Company. Robert L. Newman waiver sent on 8/25/2020, answer due 10/26/2020. (Calov, Kaitlin)
September 11, 2020 Filing 16 STRICKEN WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Federal Insurance Company. Peoples National Bank, N.A. waiver sent on 8/25/2020, answer due 10/26/2020. (Calov, Kaitlin) Modified on 9/14/2020 (kdw).
September 11, 2020 Filing 15 STRICKEN WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Federal Insurance Company. Market Street Bancshares, Inc. waiver sent on 8/25/2020, answer due 10/26/2020. (Calov, Kaitlin) Modified on 9/14/2020 (kdw).
September 9, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #10 . #11 , #12 , and #13 Waiver of Service Executed filed by Federal Insurance Company. The waiver sent dates are incorrect. E-filer is instructed to re-file with the correct dates in order to properly trigger the answer due deadline. (kdw)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 9, 2020 Filing 13 STRICKEN WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Federal Insurance Company. Terry A. Newman waiver sent on 9/3/2020, answer due 11/2/2020. (Calov, Kaitlin) Modified on 9/9/2020 (kdw).
September 9, 2020 Filing 12 STRICKEN WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Federal Insurance Company. Robert L. Newman waiver sent on 9/3/2020, answer due 11/2/2020. (Calov, Kaitlin) Modified on 9/9/2020 (kdw).
September 9, 2020 Filing 11 STRICKEN WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Federal Insurance Company. Peoples National Bank, N.A. waiver sent on 9/3/2020, answer due 11/2/2020. (Calov, Kaitlin) Modified on 9/9/2020 (kdw).
September 9, 2020 Filing 10 STRICKEN WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Federal Insurance Company. Market Street Bancshares, Inc. waiver sent on 9/3/2020, answer due 11/2/2020. (Calov, Kaitlin) Modified on 9/9/2020 (kdw).
August 25, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Robert L. Newman and original mailed to Attorney Wadley. (kdw)
August 25, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Terry A. Newman and original mailed to Attorney Wadley. (kdw)
August 25, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Peoples National Bank, N.A., and original mailed to Attorney Wadley. (kdw)
August 25, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Market Street Bancshares, Inc., and original mailed to Attorney Wadley. (kdw)
August 25, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Federal Insurance Company. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 20-818-RJD. Consent due by 9/15/2020 (kdw)
August 24, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Kaitlin M. Calov on behalf of Federal Insurance Company (Calov, Kaitlin)
August 24, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Federal Insurance Company. (Wadley, Christopher)
August 24, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher A. Wadley on behalf of Federal Insurance Company (Wadley, Christopher)
August 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-4262374.), filed by Federal Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Summons to T. Newman, #11 Summons to PNB, #12 Summons to Market Street, #13 Summons to R. Newman)(Wadley, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Insurance Company v. Market Street Bancshares, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Market Street Bancshares, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert L. Newman
Represented By: William R. Tapella, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PEOPLES NATIONAL BANK, N.A. a/k/a PEOPLES NATIONAL BANK OF MCLEANSBORO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry A. Newman
Represented By: William R. Tapella, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peoples National Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peoples National Bank of McLeansboro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher A. Wadley
Represented By: Kaitlin M. Calov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?