Vaughan v. TJX Companies, Inc
Plaintiff: Eleanor Vaughan
Defendant: TJ Maxx Companies, Inc. and TJX Companies, Inc. added per Amended Complaint doing business as Marshalls
Case Number: 3:2020cv01000
Filed: September 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Mark A Beatty
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2020 Filing 23 ANSWER TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES re #21 by All Plaintiffs. (Burford, Ellen)
November 17, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss Count II by TJX Companies, Inc.. Responses due by 12/21/2020 (Baker-Seal, Denise)
November 17, 2020 Filing 21 ANSWER to #19 Amended Complaint by TJX Companies, Inc..(Baker-Seal, Denise)
November 6, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE: All parties have consented to have a United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case. Accordingly, Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty is ASSIGNED to conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. All future documents must bear case number 20-cv-1000-MAB. Any District Judge previously assigned will no longer be assigned to this case. (kek)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 5, 2020 Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs.(Burford, Ellen)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Leave to File. Plaintiff seeks to file an amended complaint and indicates that Defendant does not oppose her motion. Given that Defendant does not object to the motion, and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a)(2) instructs that leave to amend should be freely given when justice so requires, the motion for leave to amend is granted. Plaintiff shall file a first amended complaint on or before November 12, 2020. The Court anticipates that the pending motion to dismiss (Doc. 8) will be rendered moot by the amended complaint, as Plaintiff indicated she will address Defendant's arguments from the motion to dismiss in her amended complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 11/5/2020. (spl)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 2, 2020 Filing 17 First MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by All Plaintiffs. (Burford, Ellen)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER. The TJX Companies, Inc. removed this case from St. Clair County, Illinois on September 30, 2020 pursuant to complete diversity existing between the parties (Doc. 1). In Plaintiff's original complaint, she lists the Defendant as "T.J. Maxx Companies, Inc.," which appears to be a different company than The TJX Companies, Inc., who removed this case. Additionally, The TJX Companies, Inc. explains that "T.J. Maxx Companies, Inc." does not exist (Doc. 1, p. 2). Plaintiff served The TJX Companies, Inc., and not T.J. Maxx Companies, Inc., with the original complaint. As there are conflicting names for the Defendant filed on the docket, Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED to advise the Court, through a motion, on or before November 2, 2020 whether she intends to seek leave to file an amended complaint against the appropriate Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 10/26/2020. (spl)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 23, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Ellen Ogden Burford on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Burford, Ellen)
October 23, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES re #5 by All Plaintiffs. (Burford, Ellen)
October 23, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF ACTION - See Local Rule 83.1(f). In all cases filed in, removed to, or transferred to this court, all attorneys, including government attorneys, shall file a written entry of appearance before addressing the court. Attorney Ellen Burford does not have a Notice of Appearance on file in this case (kek)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 22, 2020 Filing 12 FINAL CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Burford, Ellen) Unsealed on 11/6/2020 (kek).
October 22, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE: Eleanor Vaughan was directed to file the attached form regarding consenting or declining to consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction. The time for doing so has now passed, and the Court has not received the form. As required by Administrative Order No. 257, Eleanor Vaughan shall return the form within 7 days or face possible sanctions. The Clerk notes that due to the COVID-19 public health crisis, deadlines that were pending on or before April 1, 2020 were extended in accord with Administrative Order No. 261 and/or Amended Administrative Order No. 261. This automated notice does not take into account any such extensions. If, after the expiration of the 7-day deadline set forth herein, the Court chooses to take further action, all applicable deadline extensions will be considered at that time. Consent due by 10/29/2020 (kek)
October 15, 2020 Filing 10 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Baker-Seal, Denise) Unsealed on 11/6/2020 (kek).
October 15, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TJ Maxx Companies, Inc.. (Baker-Seal, Denise)
October 7, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Count II by TJ Maxx Companies, Inc.. Responses due by 11/9/2020 (Baker-Seal, Denise)
October 7, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #6 Motion to Dismiss filed by TJ Maxx Companies, Inc. Document attached does not contain this Court's header or case number. A properly captioned document should be re-filed. (kek)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 6, 2020 Filing 6 STRICKEN - MOTION to Dismiss Count II of Plaintiff's Complaint by TJ Maxx Companies, Inc.. Responses due by 11/9/2020 (Baker-Seal, Denise) Modified on 10/7/2020 (kek).
October 6, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by TJ Maxx Companies, Inc..(Baker-Seal, Denise)
September 30, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: TJ Maxx Companies, Inc., Eleanor Vaughan. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 20-cv-1000-MAB. Consent due by 10/21/2020 (kek)
September 30, 2020 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by The TJX Companies, Inc.. (Baker-Seal, Denise)
September 30, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Denise E. Baker-Seal on behalf of The TJX Companies, Inc. (Baker-Seal, Denise)
September 30, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Clair County, case number 2020L0610 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-4293964), filed by The TJX Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Baker-Seal, Denise)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vaughan v. TJX Companies, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TJ Maxx Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Denise E. Baker-Seal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TJX Companies, Inc. added per Amended Complaint doing business as Marshalls
Represented By: Denise E. Baker-Seal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eleanor Vaughan
Represented By: Ellen Ogden Burford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?