Ward Chrysler Center, Inc. et al v. Bank of Herrin
Plaintiff: Ward Chrysler Center, Inc., Mark Ward, Ronald Ward, RLW & MLW, LLC and Ron & Mark Ward, LLC
Defendant: Bank of Herrin
Case Number: 3:2020cv01162
Filed: November 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gilbert C Sison
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SCHEDULING and DISCOVERY ORDER: Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 1/13/2021 at 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison. Instructions for the conference call are as follows: (1) call toll-free, 888-273-3658; (2) when prompted, enter the seven-digit Access Code: 5699758; (3) when prompted, enter the four-digit Security Code: 1162 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison on 12/9/2020. (cds)
December 9, 2020 Filing 22 CJRA TRACK C assigned: Final Pretrial Conference is set for 2/16/2022 at 01:30 PM and Presumptive Trial Month is set for March, 2022 both in the East St. Louis Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison on 12/9/2020. (cds)
December 9, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE: All parties have consented to have a United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case. Accordingly, Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison is ASSIGNED to conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. All future documents must bear case number 20-1162-GCS. Any District Judge previously assigned will no longer be assigned to this case. (lmb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 9, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking 19 Notice Upon Consent to Trial by Magistrate. Incorrect judge assignment. Notice to be refiled. (lmb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 7, 2020 Filing 19 ENTRY STRICKEN: NOTICE: All parties have consented to have a United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case. Accordingly, Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel is ASSIGNED to conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. All future documents must bear case number 20-1162-NJR. Any District Judge previously assigned will no longer be assigned to this case. (lmb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. Modified on 12/9/2020 (lmb).
December 4, 2020 Filing 18 FINAL CONSENT TO TRIAL BY U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (Johnson, Mark) Modified/unsealed on 12/7/2020 (lmb).
December 4, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE to Mark S. Johnson STRIKING #14 Consent/Non-Consent to US Magistrate Judge. The Clerk's Office received your Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form. The form is incomplete. It fails to list party being represented, therefore, the pleading is STRICKEN. Please refile completed document. Another form is attached to this notice, for your convenience. Please note that pursuant to the Court's prior Order, the deadline for submitting this form is 12/23/2020. (ack)
December 3, 2020 Filing 16 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Loevy, Jon)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Responses to Plaintiff's Complaint are now due by 1/7/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison on 12/2/2020. (mjf)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 2, 2020 Filing 14 STRICKEN CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Johnson, Mark) Modified on 12/4/2020 (ack).
December 2, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing Bank of Herrin to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to Bank of Herrin on 12/02/2020. Consent due by 12/23/2020 (lmb)
December 1, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark S. Johnson on behalf of Bank of Herrin (Johnson, Mark)
December 1, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Bank of Herrin. (Johnson, Mark)
November 30, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE: All Plaintiffs were directed to file the attached form regarding consenting or declining to consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction. The time for doing so has now passed, and the Court has not received the form. As required by Administrative Order No. 257, All Plaintiffs shall return the form within 7 days or face possible sanctions. The Clerk notes that due to the COVID-19 public health crisis, deadlines that were pending on or before April 1, 2020 were extended in accord with Administrative Order No. 261 and/or Amended Administrative Order No. 261. This automated notice does not take into account any such extensions. If, after the expiration of the 7-day deadline set forth herein, the Court chooses to take further action, all applicable deadline extensions will be considered at that time. Consent due by 12/7/2020 (kek)
November 25, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ward Chrysler Center, Inc., Ronald Ward, Ron & Mark Ward, LLC, RLW & MLW, LLC, Mark Ward. Bank of Herrin served on 11/16/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. (Loevy, Jon)
November 13, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Bank of Herrin. Original mailed to Attorney Loevy. (jlrr)
November 12, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE REGARDING FILING re #6 Summons Requested. The Summons submitted is a fillable documents. Fillable documents should be converted to non-fillable PDF documents before filing on CM/ECF.This Notice is sent for informational purposes only. (kls3)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 10, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Requested. (Loevy, Jon)
November 9, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jon I. Loevy on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Loevy, Jon)
November 9, 2020 Filing 4 EXHIBIT by All Plaintiffs. Exhibit to #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet. (Loevy, Jon)
November 4, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ACTION re #1 Complaint filed by Ward Chrysler Center, Inc., Ron & Mark Ward, LLC, RLW & MLW, LLC, Ronald Ward, Mark Ward. The Civil Cover Sheet was not filed as an attachment to the Complaint. The Civil Cover sheet must be filed using the event found under Civil & Other Documents & Exhibit and linked back to the Complaint docket entry. Also, in all cases filed in, removed to, or transferred to this court, all attorneys, including government attorneys, shall file a written entry of appearance before addressing the court. Attorney Jon I. Loevy does not have a Notice of Appearance on file in this case. (ack)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 4, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: All Plaintiffs. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 20-1162-GCS. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. Consent due by 11/25/2020 (ack)
November 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bank of Herrin ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-4325371.), filed by All Plaintiffs.(Loevy, Jon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ward Chrysler Center, Inc. et al v. Bank of Herrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of Herrin
Represented By: Mark S. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ward Chrysler Center, Inc.
Represented By: Jon I. Loevy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Ward
Represented By: Jon I. Loevy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Ward
Represented By: Jon I. Loevy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RLW & MLW, LLC
Represented By: Jon I. Loevy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ron & Mark Ward, LLC
Represented By: Jon I. Loevy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?