Coil et al v. Coil
Plaintiff: John K. Coil, AVE, Inc. and John Kenneth Coil
Defendant: John A. Coil and John Altaire Coil
Case Number: 3:2020cv01173
Filed: November 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: J Phil Gilbert
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2020 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Request for Expedited Consideration filed by John Altaire Coil. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit)(Altschuler, David)
December 1, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE TERMINATING JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, and a request for reassignment having been received, this case, in its entirety, is hereby reassigned to Judge J. Phil Gilbert for further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty no longer assigned to the case. All future documents must bear case number 3:20-cv-1173-JPG. (kls3)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 1, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE REGARDING FILING re #12 Notice (Other) filed by John Altaire Coil. Incorrect event used. document has been sealed. The correct event is Civil/Other Filings/Other Documents/Consent/Non-Consent to Trial by Magistrate Judge. (kls3)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 30, 2020 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , Failure to State a Claim, Pending Lawsuits, and Improper Venue and, in the alternative, Motion to Transfer filed by John Altaire Coil. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Altschuler, David)
November 30, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , Failure to State a Claim, Pending Lawsuits, and Improper Venue and, in the alternative, Motion to Transfer by John Altaire Coil. Responses due by 1/4/2021 (Altschuler, David)
November 30, 2020 Filing 12 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by John Altaire Coil Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction and Consent/Non-Consent Form (Altschuler, David) Modified on 12/1/2020 (kls3).
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants answer or other responsive pleading is now due on or before November 30, 2020.Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 11/13/20. (klh2)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 10, 2020 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by John Altaire Coil. (Altschuler, David)
November 9, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand to State Court by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 12/14/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit and Ex, A and B, #2 Exhibit Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit Exhibits D, E and F, #4 Exhibit Exhibit G)(Maag, Thomas)
November 9, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas G. Maag on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Maag, Thomas)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (ack)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 5, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David Altschuler $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4327843 by on behalf of John Altaire Coil. (Altschuler, David)
November 5, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Rostyslaw J. Smyk on behalf of John Altaire Coil (Smyk, Rostyslaw)
November 5, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ACTION - See Local Rule 83.1(f). In all cases filed in, removed to, or transferred to this court, all attorneys, including government attorneys, shall file a written entry of appearance before addressing the court. Attorney Smyk does not have a Notice of Appearance on file in this case. (kek)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 5, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: AVE, Inc., John Kenneth Coil, and John Altaire Coil. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 20-cv-1173-MAB. Consent due by 11/30/2020 (kek)
November 4, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION Motion to Realign by John A. Coil. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Smyk, Rostyslaw)
November 4, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Madison County (Third Judicial Circuit), case number 2019L 001095 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-4326944), filed by John A. Coil. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint Complaint and Summons, #2 Exhibit Exhibit, #3 Exhibit Affidavit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Smyk, Rostyslaw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coil et al v. Coil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John A. Coil
Represented By: Rostyslaw J. Smyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Altaire Coil
Represented By: Rostyslaw J. Smyk
Represented By: David Altschuler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John K. Coil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AVE, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas G. Maag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Kenneth Coil
Represented By: Thomas G. Maag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?