In re: Angie M. McClatchery
Petitioner: Deighan Law LLC d/b/a Upright Law and Angie M McClatchery
Respondent: Nancy J. Gargula
Interested Party: US Bankruptcy Clerk
Case Number: 3:2020cv01202
Filed: November 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Stephen P McGlynn
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE that pursuant to the Order of Consolidation, all future filings shall be filed in the master case only. All future pleadings shall bear case number 20-cv-1176-SPM Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-01176-SPM, 3:20-cv-01178-SPM, 3:20-cv-01179-SPM, 3:20-cv-01180-SPM, 3:20-cv-01181-SPM, 3:20-cv-01182-SPM, 3:20-cv-01183-SPM, 3:20-cv-01184-SPM, 3:20-cv-01185-SPM, 3:20-cv-01186-SPM, 3:20-cv-01187-SPM, 3:20-cv-01189-SPM, 3:20-cv-01190-SPM, 3:20-cv-01192-SPM, 3:20-cv-01193-SPM, 3:20-cv-01194-SPM, 3:20-cv-01195-SPM, 3:20-cv-01196-SPM, 3:20-cv-01197-SPM, 3:20-cv-01198-SPM, 3:20-cv-01199-SPM, 3:20-cv-01200-SPM, 3:20-cv-01201-SPM, 3:20-cv-01202-SPM, 3:20-cv-01203-SPM, 3:20-cv-01204-SPM, 3:20-cv-01205-SPM, 3:20-cv-01207-SPM, 3:20-cv-01208-SPM, 3:20-cv-01209-SPM, 3:20-cv-01210-SPM, 3:20-cv-01211-SPM, 3:20-cv-01212-SPM, 3:20-cv-01213-SPM, 3:20-cv-01214-SPM(jlrr)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Consolidate Cases in lead case 20-1176. Signed by Judge Stephen P. McGlynn on 12/21/2020.(jsm2)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 11, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Oral Argument on Motion to Withdraw Reference by Deighan Law LLC. (Lavery, Mark)
December 4, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Deighan Law LLC. (Lavery, Mark)
November 18, 2020 Filing 3 REPLY to Response to Motion re #2 MOTION to Withdraw Reference filed by Deighan Law LLC. (Lavery, Mark)
November 4, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Withdraw Reference by Deighan Law LLC, Angie M McClatchery. (Attachments: #1 BK Transmittal of Withdrawal of Reference)(kls3)
November 4, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Stephen P. McGlynn assigned. All future documents must bear case number 3:20-cv-1202-SPM. (kls3)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Angie M. McClatchery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nancy J. Gargula
Represented By: Mark D. Skaggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Deighan Law LLC d/b/a Upright Law
Represented By: Charles A. Armgardt
Represented By: Mark T. Lavery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Angie M McClatchery
Represented By: Ronald A. Buch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: US Bankruptcy Clerk
Represented By: US Bankruptcy Clerk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?