DeLuca v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Michael Deluca
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: ssa ogc and SSAOGC
Case Number: 3:2020cv01242
Filed: November 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Mark A Beatty
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF REFERRAL: Upon consent of parties case transferred to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty for final disposition. Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel no longer assigned to the case. (kek)
December 29, 2020 Filing 10 FINAL CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Garrison, Suzanne) Unsealed on 12/30/2020 (kek).
December 29, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Suzanne M. Garrison on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Garrison, Suzanne)
December 15, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security. Original mailed to Attorney Brent Gaines. (lmb)
December 11, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Requested. (Gaines, Brent)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 11/30/2020. (drr)
November 17, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel assigned. All future documents must bear case number 20-1242-NJR. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (lmb)
November 16, 2020 Filing 4 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Gaines, Brent) Unsealed on 12/30/2020 (kek).
November 16, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael Deluca. (Gaines, Brent)
November 16, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Brent M. Gaines on behalf of Michael Deluca (Gaines, Brent)
November 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Michael Deluca. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gaines, Brent)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DeLuca v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Suzanne M. Garrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Deluca
Represented By: Brent M. Gaines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ssa ogc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSAOGC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?