Simpson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Deanna Simpson
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSAOGC
Case Number: 3:2020cv01250
Filed: November 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Staci M Yandle
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsay Beyer Payne on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Payne, Lindsay)
January 7, 2021 Filing 8 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Garrison, Suzanne)
January 7, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Suzanne M. Garrison on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Garrison, Suzanne)
December 17, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security and original mailed to Attorney Severs. (kek)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Deanna Simpson (Doc. #3 ). Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 12/17/2020. (sgp) Unsealed on 12/17/2020 (kek).
November 19, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Staci M. Yandle assigned. All future documents must bear case number 20-cv-1250-SMY. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (kek)
November 18, 2020 Filing 3 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Deanna Simpson. (Severs, Traci)
November 18, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Traci L. Severs on behalf of Deanna Simpson (Severs, Traci)
November 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Deanna Simpson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Commissioner of SSA)(Severs, Traci)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simpson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Suzanne M. Garrison
Represented By: Lindsay Beyer Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deanna Simpson
Represented By: Traci L. Severs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSAOGC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?