Terminal Railroad Association of St Louis v. Southwestern Illinois Flood Prevention District Council et al
Plaintiff: Terminal Railroad Association of St Louis
Defendant: Metro East Sanitary District and Southwestern Illinois Flood Prevention District Council
Case Number: 3:2020cv01258
Filed: November 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: David W Dugan
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1337
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER. Scheduling Conference set for 2/16/2021 at 10:00 AM via Zoom video conference before Judge David W. Dugan. The Parties will receive the appropriate Zoom invitation via email from the Court. The Joint Report of the Parties is due on or before 2/9/2021 and shall be submitted via email to DWDpd@ilsd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Judge David W. Dugan on 1/13/2021. (dmw2)
January 13, 2021 Filing 26 CJRA TRACK C assigned: Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/30/2022 at 10:00 AM and Bench Trial set for 7/11/2022 at 9:00 AM both in the East St. Louis Courthouse before Judge David W. Dugan. Signed by Judge David W. Dugan on 1/13/2021. (dmw2)
January 11, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE REGARDING FILING re #24 Answer to Complaint filed by Metro East Sanitary District, Southwestern Illinois Flood Prevention District Council. When pleadings contain multiple attorney signatures, the non-filing attorney must include the language with consent with his/her signature. See Section 2.1 of the CM/ECF Users Manual. This notice is for informational purposes and therefore no action is required. (kdw)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 8, 2021 Filing 24 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by All Defendants.(Hermeling, Caroline)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge J. Phil Gilbert recused. Case reassigned to Judge David W. Dugan for all further proceedings Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 12/16/2020. (jdh)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 12/14/2020. (sgp)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Metro East Sanitary District, Southwestern Illinois Flood Prevention District Council (Doc. #18 ). Metro East Sanitary District answer due 1/8/2021; Southwestern Illinois Flood Prevention District Council answer due 1/8/2021. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 12/11/2020. (sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Hermeling on behalf of Defendants Metro East Sanitary and Southwestern Illinois Food Prevention District Council. (kdw)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 9, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Caroline L. Hermeling $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4352978 by on behalf of Metro East Sanitary District, Southwestern Illinois Flood Prevention District Council. (Hermeling, Caroline)
December 9, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by All Defendants. (Sprague, Robert)
December 9, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Sprague on behalf of All Defendants (Sprague, Robert)
December 3, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE TERMINATING JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, and a request for reassignment having been received, this case, in its entirety, is hereby reassigned to Judge Staci M. Yandle for further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly no longer assigned to the case. All future documents must bear case number 20-cv-1258-SMY. (kek)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 2, 2020 Filing 15 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Hayde, Thomas)
December 2, 2020 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Terminal Railroad Association of St Louis identifying Other Affiliate Norfolk Southern Railway, Other Affiliate CSX Transportation, Inc., Other Affiliate Illinois Central Railroad Company, Other Affiliate Union Pacific Railroad Company for Terminal Railroad Association of St Louis. (Hayde, Thomas)
December 1, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Terminal Railroad Association of St Louis. Southwestern Illinois Flood Prevention District Council served on 11/20/2020, answer due 12/11/2020. (Hayde, Thomas)
December 1, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Terminal Railroad Association of St Louis. Metro East Sanitary District served on 11/20/2020, answer due 12/11/2020. (Hayde, Thomas)
November 30, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #10 Return of Service Executed filed by Terminal Railroad Association of St Louis, #9 Return of Service Executed filed by Terminal Railroad Association of St Louis. Incorrect event selected. Select the event which most closely matches the document being filed. For this document, the correct event is "Summons Returned Executed. E-filer is instructed to re-file using Civil>Service ofProcess> Summons Returned Executed in order to properly trigger the answer duedeadline. (ack)
November 25, 2020 Filing 10 STRICKEN RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED by Terminal Railroad Association of St Louis on 11/20/2020. (Hayde, Thomas) Modified on 11/30/2020 (ack).
November 25, 2020 Filing 9 STRICKEN RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED by Terminal Railroad Association of St Louis on 11/20/2020. (Hayde, Thomas) Modified on 11/30/2020 (ack).
November 20, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Metro East Sanitary District and original mailed to Attorney Hayde. (kdw)
November 20, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Southwestern Illinois Flood Prevention District Council and original mailed to Attorney Hayde. (kdw)
November 20, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Seong J. Hong on behalf of Terminal Railroad Association of St Louis (Hong, Seong)
November 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Gerald P. Greiman on behalf of Terminal Railroad Association of St Louis (Greiman, Gerald)
November 20, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas W. Hayde, Jr on behalf of Terminal Railroad Association of St Louis (Hayde, Thomas)
November 20, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ACTION re #1 Complaint, filed by Terminal Railroad Association of St Louis. See Local Rule 83.1(f). In all cases filed in, removed to, or transferred to this court, all attorneys, including government attorneys, shall file a written entry of appearance before addressing the court. Attorney Hayde does not have a Notice of Appearance on file in this case. In addition the submitted summonses are fillable documents. Fillable documents should be converted to non-fillable PDF before filing on CM/ECF and the return address should have the attorneys listed address. Re-filing of the summonses is not necessary, as it is just additional information for any future filings. (kdw)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 20, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Terminal Railroad Association of St Louis. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 20-1258-RJD. Consent due by 12/11/2020 (kdw)
November 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Metro East Sanitary District, Southwestern Illinois Flood Prevention District Council ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-4339492.), filed by Terminal Railroad Association of St Louis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Project Description Letter, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Package Offer, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Hayde, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Terminal Railroad Association of St Louis v. Southwestern Illinois Flood Prevention District Council et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terminal Railroad Association of St Louis
Represented By: Thomas W. Hayde, Jr.
Represented By: Gerald P. Greiman
Represented By: Seong J. Hong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metro East Sanitary District
Represented By: Caroline L. Hermeling
Represented By: Robert J. Sprague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwestern Illinois Flood Prevention District Council
Represented By: Caroline L. Hermeling
Represented By: Robert J. Sprague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?