Rea v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Cassie D. Rea
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security and SSAOGC
Case Number: 3:2020cv01264
Filed: November 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Rosenstengel
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2021 Filing 11 RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED by Cassie D. Rea on 12/28/20. (Schultz, Barry)
January 15, 2021 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED by Cassie D. Rea on 12/15/20. (Schultz, Barry)
January 15, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cassie D. Rea. Commissioner of Social Security served on 12/22/2020, answer due 2/22/2021. (Schultz, Barry)
January 7, 2021 Filing 8 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Garrison, Suzanne)
January 7, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Suzanne M. Garrison on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Garrison, Suzanne)
December 1, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, and returned to Attorney Schultz for service. (kls3)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 11/30/2020. (mlp)
November 24, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel assigned. All future documents must bear case number 20-1264-NJR. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (amv)
November 24, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Cassie D. Rea. (Schultz, Barry)
November 24, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Barry A. Schultz on behalf of Cassie D. Rea (Schultz, Barry)
November 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Cassie D. Rea. (Attachments: #1 AC decision, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Schultz, Barry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rea v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cassie D. Rea
Represented By: Barry A. Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Suzanne M. Garrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSAOGC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?