Hunt v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Darrin Wayne Hunt
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSAOGC
Case Number: 3:2020cv01291
Filed: December 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Mark A Beatty
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF REFERRAL: Upon consent of parties case transferred to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty for final disposition. Judge David W. Dugan no longer assigned to the case. (trb)
January 8, 2021 Filing 9 FINAL CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Sutterfield, David)UNSEALED on 1/13/2021 (trb).
January 7, 2021 Filing 8 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Garrison, Suzanne) unsealed on 1/13/2021 (trb).
January 7, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Suzanne M. Garrison on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Garrison, Suzanne)
December 15, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security. Original mailed to Attorney David Sutterfield. (lmb)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. For the reasons stated in the attached Memorandum & Order, Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. Signed by Judge David W. Dugan on 12/10/2020. (kll)
December 4, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge David W. Dugan assigned. All future documents must bear case number 20-1291-DWD. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (trb)
December 3, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by David W. Sutterfield on behalf of Darrin Wayne Hunt (Sutterfield, David)
December 3, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Darrin Wayne Hunt. (Sutterfield, David)
December 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Darrin Wayne Hunt. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate of Interest, #3 Summons, #4 USM-285 form 1, #5 USM-285 form 2, #6 USM-285 form 3)(Sutterfield, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunt v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Suzanne M. Garrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrin Wayne Hunt
Represented By: David W. Sutterfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSAOGC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?