Bush v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Todd A Bush
Defendant: Andrew M Saul and Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSAOGC
Case Number: 3:2020cv01303
Filed: December 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Stephen P McGlynn
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2021 Filing 11 RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED by Todd A Bush on 1/21/2021. (Schultz, Barry)
February 3, 2021 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED by Todd A Bush on 1/5/2021. (Schultz, Barry)
February 3, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Todd A Bush. Commissioner of Social Security served on 1/13/2021, answer due 3/15/2021. (Schultz, Barry)
January 29, 2021 Filing 8 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Garrison, Suzanne)
January 29, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Suzanne M. Garrison on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Garrison, Suzanne)
December 15, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security. Original mailed to Attorney Barry Schultz (lmb)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Stephen P. McGlynn on 12/11/2020. (jce)
December 8, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Stephen P. McGlynn assigned. All future documents must bear case number 20-1303-SPM. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (lmb)
December 7, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Todd A Bush. (Schultz, Barry)
December 7, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Barry A. Schultz on behalf of Todd A Bush (Schultz, Barry)
December 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M Saul, filed by Todd A Bush. (Attachments: #1 AC decision, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Schultz, Barry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bush v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd A Bush
Represented By: Barry A. Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Suzanne M. Garrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSAOGC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?