Lueken v. Barnes-Jewish Hospital et al
Plaintiff: Jennifer Lynn Lueken
Defendant: Barnes-Jewish Hospital and Jason Rich
Case Number: 3:2020cv01346
Filed: December 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: J Phil Gilbert
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 2/26/2021. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 2/10/2021. (jdh)
January 6, 2021 Filing 10 Letter to Court from Plaintiff (kls3)
December 28, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (kls3)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER deferring ruling on #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Court ORDERS that Lueken shall have up to and including January 29, 2021, to file an amended complaint asserting a proper basis for federal jurisdiction. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 12/28/2020. (tlp)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge J. Phil Gilbert for all further proceedings. All future filings should reflect case number 20-cv-1346-JPG. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 12/17/2020. (drb)
December 17, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #5 Order. Case was incorrectly transferred to Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly. Order is stricken. (drb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STRICKEN - ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel no longer assigned to case. All future filings shall reflect case number 20-cv-1346-RJD. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 12/17/2020. (drb) Modified on 12/17/2020 (drb).
December 17, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jennifer Lynn Lueken. (kls3)
December 17, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Barnes-Jewish Hospital, Jason Rich, filed by Jennifer Lynn Lueken.(kls3)
December 17, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing Jennifer Lynn Lueken to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to Jennifer Lynn Lueken on 12/17/2020. Consent due by 1/7/2021 (kls3)
December 17, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel assigned. All future documents must bear case number 3:20-cv-1346-NJR Refer to the pro se litigant guide, found on the ILSD website, for further information. (kls3)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lueken v. Barnes-Jewish Hospital et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barnes-Jewish Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Lynn Lueken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?