Fehsenfeld v. Southern Illinois Transfer Inc
Plaintiff: Andrew Fehsenfeld
Defendant: Southern Illinois Transfer Inc
Case Number: 3:2021cv00019
Filed: January 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Reona J Daly
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 688
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY: Disputes which require a ruling on a motion made under Rule 37 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure will be handled in the following manner. The party seeking a discovery order shall request a prompt telephone conference with Judge Daly and opposing counsel by alerting the law clerk assigned to the case and providing the law clerk with appropriate material, such as: (1) a list or summary of the items in dispute, (2) copies of written requests/objections/privilege logs in dispute, and (3) an estimate of the amount of time needed to present argument to the Court. Law clerks prefer to receive these materials through Judge Daly's email depository for proposed documents. Prior to seeking a telephone conference with Judge Daly, the parties must meet and confer in an attempt to resolve the dispute informally. Argument on motions to compel discovery or for discovery sanctions shall be presented orally at the telephone conference. Written motions or legal memoranda will not be accepted unless specifically requested. Signed by Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly on 2/18/2021. (jlm)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 18, 2021 Filing 14 CJRA TRACK B assigned. Scheduling and Discovery Conference set for 3/11/2021 at 9:30 AM via telephone before Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly. To join the conference call, the parties should call Judge Daly's conference line at 618-439-7731. The parties are to submit a Joint Report of Parties and Proposed Scheduling and Discovery Order using the form provided in the Local Rules, seven (7) days before the conference. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/21/2022 at 1:30 PM in Benton Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly. Jury Trial set for 4/5/2022 at 9:00 AM in Benton Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly. (jlm)
February 17, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE: All parties have consented to have a United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case. Accordingly, Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly is ASSIGNED to conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. All future documents must bear case number 21-cv-19-RJD. Any District Judge previously assigned will no longer be assigned to this case. (tba)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 16, 2021 Filing 12 FINAL CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Settergren, Neal) Modified on 2/17/2021 (tba).
January 25, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing Southern Illinois Transfer Inc to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to Southern Illinois Transfer Inc on 1/25/2021. Consent due by 2/16/2021 (tba)
January 22, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Andrew Fehsenfeld. Southern Illinois Transfer Inc waiver sent on 1/11/2021, answer due 3/12/2021. (Dripps, Roy)
January 22, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Giles Benjamin Howard on behalf of Southern Illinois Transfer Inc (Howard, Giles)
January 22, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Neal W Settergren on behalf of Southern Illinois Transfer Inc (Settergren, Neal)
January 13, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE REGARDING FILING re #6 Consent/Non-Consent to US Magistrate Judge.The Consent/Non-Consent form is a fillable document. Fillable documents should be converted to non-fillable PDF before filing on CM/ECF. This notice is for informational purposes and therefore no action is required. (tba)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 12, 2021 Filing 6 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Dripps, Roy)
January 11, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Andrew Fehsenfeld. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 21-cv-19-RJD. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. Consent due by 2/1/2021 (tba)
January 8, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael T. Blotevogel on behalf of Andrew Fehsenfeld (Blotevogel, Michael)
January 8, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles W. Armbruster, III on behalf of Andrew Fehsenfeld (Armbruster, Charles)
January 8, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Roy C. Dripps on behalf of Andrew Fehsenfeld (Dripps, Roy)
January 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Southern Illinois Transfer Inc ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0754-4373993.), filed by Andrew Fehsenfeld. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dripps, Roy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fehsenfeld v. Southern Illinois Transfer Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Fehsenfeld
Represented By: Michael T. Blotevogel
Represented By: Roy C. Dripps
Represented By: Charles W. Armbruster, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Illinois Transfer Inc
Represented By: Giles Benjamin Howard
Represented By: Neal W Settergren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?