Moore v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Stephen Alexander Moore and Stephen A. Moore
Defendant: Andrew M Saul and Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel and SSAOGC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00020
Filed: January 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Mark A Beatty
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE OF REFERRAL: Upon consent of parties case transferred to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty for final disposition. Judge Staci M. Yandle no longer assigned to the case. (kek)
March 2, 2021 Filing 10 FINAL CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Garrison, Suzanne) Unsealed on 3/3/2021 (kek).
March 2, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Suzanne M. Garrison on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Garrison, Suzanne)
February 11, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security. Original mailed to Attorney Paul B. Eaglin. (tba)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. #3 ). Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 2/9/2021. (sgp)
January 11, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF MODIFICATION - Parties to this action were not named in accordance with the Complaint and/or this Court's Instructions for Searching and Adding Parties, which can be located on our website. Parties have been re-named accordingly: Plaintiff Stephen A. Moore, Defendant Commissioner of Social Security, Interested Party SSAOGC. No further action is required by the filer in relation to this notification. (kek)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 11, 2021 Filing 5 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Staci M. Yandle assigned. All future documents must bear case number 21-cv-20-SMY. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (kek)
January 8, 2021 Filing 4 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Eaglin, Paul) Unsealed on 3/3/2021 (kek).
January 8, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Stephen Alexander Moore. (Eaglin, Paul)
January 8, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul B. Eaglin on behalf of Stephen Alexander Moore (Eaglin, Paul)
January 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M Saul, filed by Stephen Alexander Moore. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons US Attorney, #3 Summons OGC SSA Chicago, #4 Summons AG USA)(Eaglin, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSAOGC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Alexander Moore
Represented By: Paul B. Eaglin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen A. Moore
Represented By: Paul B. Eaglin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Suzanne M. Garrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?