Luecking et al v. ILLINOIS CENTRAL SCHOOL BUS, LLC
Plaintiff: Rebecca Luecking and Tracey Meyer
Defendant: ILLINOIS CENTRAL SCHOOL BUS, LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00109
Filed: January 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gilbert C Sison
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2021 Filing 11 JUDGMENT IN A Civil Action. Approved by Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison on 2/23/2021. (cds)
February 23, 2021 Filing 10 Attorney Roberto Costales advised the Clerks Office that he will not apply for admission. No further documents will be provided to Attorney Roberto Costales by the court. (tba)
February 23, 2021 Filing 9 STIPULATION of Dismissal Stipulation and Order of Dismissal by Illinois Central School Bus, LLC. (Wissa, Michael)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time. The Court ALLOWS defendant up to and including March 1, 2021 to respond to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison on 2/3/2021. (klh)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 3, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Illinois Central School Bus, LLC. (Wissa, Michael)
February 1, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Paula M. Ketcham on behalf of Illinois Central School Bus, LLC (Ketcham, Paula)
February 1, 2021 Filing 5 Letter to Attorney Costales regarding admission to SDIL. (tba)
February 1, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: All Parties. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 21-cv-109-GCS. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. Consent due by 2/22/2021 (tba)
January 29, 2021 Filing 3 EXHIBIT by ILLINOIS CENTRAL SCHOOL BUS, LLC. Exhibit to #1 Notice of Removal, CIVIL COVER SHEET. (Wissa, Michael)
January 29, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P. Wissa on behalf of ILLINOIS CENTRAL SCHOOL BUS, LLC (Wissa, Michael)
January 29, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Clair County, case number 20L1028 ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0754-4390549), filed by ILLINOIS CENTRAL SCHOOL BUS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Wissa, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luecking et al v. ILLINOIS CENTRAL SCHOOL BUS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Luecking
Represented By: Roberto Costales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracey Meyer
Represented By: Roberto Costales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ILLINOIS CENTRAL SCHOOL BUS, LLC
Represented By: Michael P. Wissa
Represented By: Paula M. Ketcham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?