Legacy Corporation of Illinois
Petitioner: Legacy Corporation of Illinois
Claimant: Unknown Claimants
Case Number: 3:2021cv00176
Filed: February 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: J Phil Gilbert
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2021 Filing 12 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (McGovern, Timothy)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER, granting #3 MOTION Exemption from Posting a Bond Pursuant to 46 U.S.C. 30511(b)(1)(A) filed by Legacy Corporation of Illinois. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 2/22/2021. (jdh)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER, granting #5 MOTION to deposit $250.00 into Court Registry in Lieu of Cost Bond filed by Legacy Corporation of Illinois. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 2/22/2021. (jdh)
February 19, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE TERMINATING JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, and a request for reassignment having been received, this case, in its entirety, is hereby reassigned to Judge J. Phil Gilbert for further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly no longer assigned to the case. All future documents must bear case number 3:21-cv-176-JPG. (kls3)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 16, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Legacy Corporation of Illinois. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 21-176-RJD. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. Consent due by 3/9/2021 (ack)
February 12, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Legacy Corporation of Illinois. (McGovern, Timothy)
February 12, 2021 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION to deposit $250.00 into Court Registry in Lieu of Cost Bond filed by Legacy Corporation of Illinois. (McGovern, Timothy)
February 12, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to deposit $250.00 into Court Registry in Lieu of Cost Bond by Legacy Corporation of Illinois. (McGovern, Timothy)
February 12, 2021 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3 MOTION Exemption from Posting a Bond Pursuant to 46 U.S.C. 30511(b)(1)(A) filed by Legacy Corporation of Illinois. (McGovern, Timothy)
February 12, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION Exemption from Posting a Bond Pursuant to 46 U.S.C. 30511(b)(1)(A) by Legacy Corporation of Illinois. (McGovern, Timothy)
February 12, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy S. McGovern on behalf of Legacy Corporation of Illinois (McGovern, Timothy)
February 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Exoneration From or Limitation of Liability against Unknown Claimants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0754-4402450.), filed by Legacy Corporation of Illinois. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Coversheet, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Michael J. Seiler, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Blake Enloe)(McGovern, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Legacy Corporation of Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Legacy Corporation of Illinois
Represented By: Timothy S. McGovern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Unknown Claimants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?