Canjar v. Bayer CropScience LP et al
Plaintiff: Jason J. Canjar doing business as Yedinak Registered Holsteins and Jason J. Canjar on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated doing business as Yedinak Registered Holsteins
Defendant: Federated Co-Operatives Ltd., Bayer CropScience LP, Corteva Inc., BASF Corporation, Nutrien AG Solutions Inc., CHS Inc., Growmark Inc., Tenkoz Inc., Simplot AB Retail Sub, Inc., Bayer CropScience, Inc., Winfield Solutions, LLC, Univar Solutions, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Cargill Incorporated and Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00181
Filed: February 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Rosenstengel
Referring Judge: Gilbert C Sison
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1337
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER: A Telephonic Status Conference is set for 5/6/2021 at 9:30 AM CST before Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel. Instructions for the conference call are as follows: (1) call toll-free, 877-336-1831; (2) when prompted, enter the seven-digit Access Code: 9139610. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 4/6/2021. (drb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 6, 2021 Filing 35 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking 34 Order,. Incorrect hearing date given. Entry is stricken. (drb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STRICKEN - ORDER: A Telephonic Status Conference is set for 4/6/2021 at 9:30 AM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel. Instructions for the conference call are as follows: (1) call toll-free, 877-336-1831; (2) when prompted, enter the seven-digit Access Code: 9139610. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 4/6/2021. (drb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. Modified on 4/6/2021 (drb).
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER DENYING #24 Motion to Stay Pending Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed by Defendants. Defendants' alternative request to extend the deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the Consolidated Amended Complaint is GRANTED. Defendants shall file their responsive pleading on or before April 27, 2021. A telephonic status conference will be set by separate Order. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 4/6/2021. (mlp) Modified on 4/6/2021 (mlp).
April 1, 2021 Filing 32 REPLY to Response to Motion re #24 MOTION to Stay Pending Decision by The Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation Or, In the Alternative, For an Extension of Time to Respond filed by All Defendants. (Nester, Michael)
March 30, 2021 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Randall P. Ewing, Jr on behalf of Jason J. Canjar (Ewing, Randall)
March 26, 2021 Filing 30 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #24 MOTION to Stay Pending Decision by The Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation Or, In the Alternative, For an Extension of Time to Respond filed by Jason J. Canjar. (King, Robert)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #28 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Marc H. Edelson on behalf of Jason J. Canjar. (trb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 19, 2021 Filing 28 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Marc H. Edelson $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4433540 by on behalf of Jason J. Canjar. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Edelson, Marc)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING #26 Agreed Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiffs shall file their response to the Motion to Transfer Venue Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) filed by Defendants Bayer CropScience, LP and Bayer CropScience Inc. on or before March 24, 2021. Responses due by 3/24/2021. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 3/17/2021. (mlp) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 17, 2021 Filing 26 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Bayer CropScience Defendants Motion to Transfer Venue Under 28 USC 1404(a) by Jason J. Canjar. (Ewing, Randall)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #22 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Eric J. Mahr on behalf of Cargill Incorporated. (ack)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 12, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION to Stay Pending Decision by The Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation Or, In the Alternative, For an Extension of Time to Respond by Syngenta Corporation. (Nester, Michael)
March 12, 2021 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cargill Incorporated. (Mahr, Eric)
March 12, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Eric J. Mahr $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4426853 by on behalf of Cargill Incorporated. (Mahr, Eric)
March 11, 2021 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Corteva Inc.. (Flack, Donald)
March 11, 2021 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent E.I du Pont de Nemours & Company (DuPont), Other Affiliate Corteva, Inc. for Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc.. (Flack, Donald)
March 11, 2021 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Syngenta Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Other Affiliate Syngenta AG for Syngenta Corporation. (Nester, Michael)
March 11, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Nester on behalf of Syngenta Corporation (Nester, Michael)
March 11, 2021 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tenkoz Inc.. (McCaffrey, Timothy)
March 11, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy McCaffrey on behalf of Tenkoz Inc. (McCaffrey, Timothy)
March 11, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald M. Flack, Jr on behalf of Corteva Inc., Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc. (Flack, Donald)
March 9, 2021 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CHS Inc.. (Osborn, Kathy)
March 9, 2021 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BASF Corporation. (Bozarth, Troy)
March 9, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Troy A. Bozarth on behalf of BASF Corporation (Bozarth, Troy)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kathy L. Osbornon behalf of CHS Inc. (trb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 5, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kathy L. Osborn $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4420291 by on behalf of CHS Inc.. (Osborn, Kathy)
March 5, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #8 Notice Requesting Consent. Document stricken as it was entered in error. Case was transferred to Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel. (trb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 4, 2021 Filing 8 ENTRY STRICKEN:NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing Growmark Inc. to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to Growmark Inc. on 3/4/21. Consent due by 3/25/2021 (trb) Modified on 3/5/2021 (trb).
March 3, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Growmark Inc.. (Noeltner, Barry)
March 3, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Barry S. Noeltner on behalf of Growmark Inc. (Noeltner, Barry)
February 18, 2021 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT Consolidated Class Action Complaint against All Defendants, filed by Jason J. Canjar.(King, Robert)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. This matter is before the Court sua sponte for case management purposes. This case is related to another case presently before Chief Judge Rosenstengel (See SDIL case number 21-cv-00021-NJR). The Seventh Circuit has emphasized that related cases filed within the same court should be transferred to (or consolidated before) a single judge in order to promote judicial economy and efficiency and avoid the unnecessary duplication of efforts. See, e.g. Smith v. Check-N-Go of Illinois, Inc., 200 F.3d 511, 513 n.1 (7th Cir. 1999); Blair v. Equifax Check Services, Inc., 181 F.3d 832, 839 (7th Cir. 1999). Accordingly, the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to REASSIGN this case to Chief Judge Rosenstengel. All future documents filed in this matter shall bear the case number 21-cv-00181-NJR. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison no longer assigned to case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison on 2/17/2021. (klh)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 16, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Jason J. Canjar. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 21-181-GCS. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. Consent due by 3/9/2021 (trb)
February 16, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert L. King on behalf of JASON J. CANJAR (King, Robert)
February 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0754-4402981.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(King, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Canjar v. Bayer CropScience LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federated Co-Operatives Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer CropScience LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corteva Inc.
Represented By: Donald M. Flack, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BASF Corporation
Represented By: Troy A. Bozarth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nutrien AG Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHS Inc.
Represented By: Kathy L. Osborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Growmark Inc.
Represented By: Barry S. Noeltner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tenkoz Inc.
Represented By: Timothy J. McCaffrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simplot AB Retail Sub, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer CropScience, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winfield Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Univar Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syngenta Corporation
Represented By: Michael J. Nester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cargill Incorporated
Represented By: Eric J. Mahr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc.
Represented By: Donald M. Flack, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason J. Canjar doing business as Yedinak Registered Holsteins
Represented By: Robert L. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason J. Canjar on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated doing business as Yedinak Registered Holsteins
Represented By: Robert L. King
Represented By: Randall P. Ewing, Jr.
Represented By: Marc H. Edelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?