City of East St. Louis, Illinois v. Monsanto Corporation
Plaintiff: City of East St. Louis, Illinois
Defendant: Monsanto Corporation, Pharmacia LLC, Monsanto Company, Solutia, Inc., Pharmacia Corporation and Does 1-100
Case Number: 3:2021cv00232
Filed: March 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: David W Dugan
Referring Judge: Gilbert C Sison
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2021 Filing 29 AMENDED COMPLAINT First against Monsanto Corporation, Pharmacia LLC, Solutia, Inc., filed by City of East St. Louis, Illinois. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Baricevic, C.)
April 23, 2021 Filing 28 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #27 Amended Complaint, filed by City of East St. Louis, Illinois. Document 27 is an Amended Complaint that was filed against themselves. Due to Answer due dates not being configured, the event is stricken and should be re-filed. Any new defendants or renamed defendants should be added at the time of filing the Amended Complaint. (kls3)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 22, 2021 Filing 27 STRICKEN. AMENDED COMPLAINT First against City of East St. Louis, Illinois, filed by City of East St. Louis, Illinois. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Baricevic, C.) Modified on 4/23/2021 (kls3).
April 5, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary E Howerton on behalf of City of East St. Louis, Illinois (Howerton, Zachary)
April 5, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Roy L Mason on behalf of City of East St. Louis, Illinois (Mason, Roy)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #11 Motion for More Definite Statement. On March 8, 2021, Defendants moved for a more definite statement prior to consolidation of this case with Case Nos. 21-cv-232 through 21-cv-237 and 21-cv-239 through 21-cv-241. Similar motions were filed in each of the now-consolidated cases. Plaintiff does not object to filing a more detailed complaint and requests additional time to do so. As such, Defendants' motions for more definite statement are GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint in this action on or before April 23, 2021. Signed by Judge David W. Dugan on 3/26/2021. (kll)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 26, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint in this action on or before April 23, 2021. (Amended Pleadings due by 4/23/2021). (lmb)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge David W. Dugan for all further proceedings. Judge J. Phil Gilbert no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 3/25/2021. (jdh)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 24, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE TERMINATING JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, and a request for reassignment having been received, this case, in its entirety, is hereby reassigned to Judge J. Phil Gilbert for further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison no longer assigned to the case. All future documents must bear case number 21-232-JPG. (lmb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 23, 2021 Filing 21 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Miller, Adam)
March 23, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE OF MODIFICATION re #19 Notice (Other) filed by Solutia, Inc. Incorrect filing event used. Document should have been filed using the event "Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge" located under Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents, which would have placed the document under seal. Docket text and document security have been modified accordingly. No further action is required by the filer in relation to this notification. (kek)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 22, 2021 Filing 19 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties (Martin, Mitchell) Modified on 3/23/2021 (kek).
March 22, 2021 Filing 18 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Driscoll, John)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Over any objection Defendants may have, the Court GRANTS the motion to consolidate the subject nine public nuisance citation actions into Cause No. 3:21-cv-00232-GCS. All further pleadings shall be filed in No. 3:21-cv-00232-GCS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison on 3/22/2021. (mjf)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 16, 2021 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re #11 MOTION for More Definite Statement and Motion for Extension of Time filed by City of East St. Louis, Illinois. (Driscoll, John)
March 16, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by City of East St. Louis, Illinois. (Driscoll, John)
March 10, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Sims on behalf of City of East St. Louis, Illinois (Sims, Melissa)
March 9, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Grey R. Chatham, Jr on behalf of City of East St. Louis, Illinois (Chatham, Grey)
March 9, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by C. John Baricevic on behalf of City of East St. Louis, Illinois (Baricevic, C.)
March 8, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for More Definite Statement by Monsanto Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Miller, Adam)
March 3, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul W. Johnson on behalf of City of East St. Louis, Illinois (Johnson, Paul)
March 3, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher J. Quinn on behalf of City of East St. Louis, Illinois (Quinn, Christopher)
March 3, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by John J. Driscoll on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Driscoll, John)
March 2, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine D. Landfried on behalf of Monsanto Corporation (Landfried, Katherine)
March 2, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam E. Miller on behalf of Monsanto Corporation (Miller, Adam)
March 2, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ACTION. See Local Rule 83.1(f). In all cases filed in, removed to, or transferred to this court, all attorneys, including government attorneys, shall file a written entry of appearance before addressing the court. Attorneys Miller and Baricevic do not have a Notice of Appearance on file in this case. (lmb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 2, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Corporation identifying Corporate Parent BAYER AG for Monsanto Corporation. (Miller, Adam)
March 2, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: City of East St. Louis, Illinois, Monsanto Corporation. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 21-232-GCS. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. Consent due by 3/23/2021 (lmb)
March 1, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Corporation identifying Corporate Parent BAYER AG for Monsanto Corporation. (Miller, Adam)
March 1, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Clair County, case number 21OV0000276 ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0754-4415741), filed by Monsanto Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Miller, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of East St. Louis, Illinois v. Monsanto Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of East St. Louis, Illinois
Represented By: C. John Baricevic
Represented By: Zachary E Howerton
Represented By: Melissa Sims
Represented By: Grey R. Chatham, Jr.
Represented By: Paul W. Johnson
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Roy L Mason
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Corporation
Represented By: Adam E. Miller
Represented By: Katherine D. Landfried
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharmacia LLC
Represented By: Katherine D. Landfried
Represented By: Adam E. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solutia, Inc.
Represented By: Mitchell A. Martin
Represented By: Bernard J. Ysursa, Sr.
Represented By: Charles R. Hobbs, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharmacia Corporation
Represented By: Katherine D. Landfried
Represented By: Adam E. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?