City of East St. Louis, Illinois v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: City of East St. Louis, Illinois
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2021cv00234
Filed: March 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: David W Dugan
Referring Judge: Gilbert C Sison
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: This case is consolidated with 21-cv-00232-DWD, which is assigned to District Judge David W. Dugan. Thus, the undersigned transfers this case to District Judge Dugan for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison on 3/25/2021. (dkd)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER finding as moot #13 Motion for More Definite Statement; granting #17 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Over any objection Defendants my have, the Court GRANTS the motion to consolidate the subject nine public nuisance citation actions into Cause No. 3:21-cv-00232-GCS. All further pleadings shall be filed in No. 3:21-cv-00232-GCS. Further, the Court DENIES as moot the #13 Motion for More Definite Statement in this action. Plaintiffs shall file a response to the motion for more definite statement in No. 3:21-cv-00232-GCS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison on 3/22/2021. (mjf)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 16, 2021 Filing 18 RESPONSE to Motion re #13 MOTION for More Definite Statement and Motion for Extension of Time filed by City of East St. Louis, Illinois. (Driscoll, John)
March 16, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by City of East St. Louis, Illinois. (Driscoll, John)
March 10, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Sims on behalf of City of East St. Louis, Illinois (Sims, Melissa)
March 9, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Grey R. Chatham, Jr on behalf of City of East St. Louis, Illinois (Chatham, Grey)
March 9, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by C. John Baricevic on behalf of City of East St. Louis, Illinois (Baricevic, C.)
March 8, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for More Definite Statement by Monsanto Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Miller, Adam)
March 3, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul W. Johnson on behalf of City of East St. Louis, Illinois (Johnson, Paul)
March 3, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher J. Quinn on behalf of City of East St. Louis, Illinois (Quinn, Christopher)
March 3, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by John J. Driscoll on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Driscoll, John)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: This matter is before the Court sua sponte for case management purposes. This case and five others were recently removed to this Court. It has been determined that all six cases should all be handled by a single judge in order to promote judicial economy and efficiency and avoid the unnecessary duplication of efforts. See, e.g. Smith v. Check-N-Go of Illinois, Inc., 200 F.3d 511, 513 n.1 (7th Cir. 1999); Blair v. Equifax Check Services, Inc., 181 F.3d 832, 839 (7th Cir. 1999). Accordingly, the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to REASSIGN this case to Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison. Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty no longer assigned to case. All future documents filed in this matter shall bear the case number 20-cv-234-GCS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 3/2/2021. (klh2)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 2, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine D. Landfried on behalf of Monsanto Company (Landfried, Katherine)
March 2, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam E. Miller on behalf of Monsanto Company (Miller, Adam)
March 2, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ACTION: See Local Rule 83.1(f). In all cases filed in, removed to, or transferred to this court, all attorneys, including government attorneys, shall file a written entry of appearance before addressing the court. Attorneys C. John Baricevic and Adam E. Miller do not have a Notice of Appearance on file in this case. (amv)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 2, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Monsanto Company as it is a duplicate of Document 2. (amv)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 2, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: City of East St. Louis, Illinois, Monsanto Company. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 21-234-MAB. Consent due by 3/23/2021 (amv)
March 2, 2021 Filing 3 STRICKEN Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company identifying Corporate Parent BAYER AG for Monsanto Company. (Miller, Adam)
March 1, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company identifying Corporate Parent BAYER AG for Monsanto Company. (Miller, Adam)
March 1, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Clair County, case number 21OV0000282 ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0754-4415762), filed by Monsanto Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Miller, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of East St. Louis, Illinois v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of East St. Louis, Illinois
Represented By: C. John Baricevic
Represented By: Melissa Sims
Represented By: Grey R. Chatham, Jr.
Represented By: Paul W. Johnson
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Represented By: Adam E. Miller
Represented By: Katherine D. Landfried
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?